(PC) Forster v. Clendenin et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Forster
Defendant: Stephanie Clendenin and Brandon Price
Case Number: 1:2022cv01191
Filed: September 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: BakersfieldMJ
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL: Due to the elevation of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is temporarily referred to *Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate judge is appointed. Documents filed in this case shall include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(BAM)* (Sant Agata, S)
September 21, 2022 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 10/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Huang, H)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:22-cv-1614-DB) to Fresno (1:22-cv-1191-BAK) signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/20/2022. (Huang, H)
September 21, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Notice of Temporary Magistrate Judge Referral, served on Joshua Forster. (Sant Agata, S)
September 21, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Transfer Order, #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Joshua Forster. (Huang, H)
September 15, 2022 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 10/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Her, S)
September 15, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Joshua Forster. (Her, S)
September 14, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Joshua Forster. (Her, S)
September 14, 2022 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Stephanie Clendenin, Brandon Price by Joshua Forster.(Her, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Forster v. Clendenin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Forster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Clendenin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?