(PC) Young v. Clark et al
Plaintiff: Tyrone Powell Young
Defendant: Ken Clark, M. Gamboa, Galleger, A. Randolph, G. Cortez, A. Loza, J. Flores, J. Webb, Chief Medical Officer, M. Rodriguez, J. Cabrera, G. Garza, L. Padrnos and J. Perez
Case Number: 1:2022cv01219
Filed: September 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for an Order for CDCR to Generate a cashier check for $402.00 to pay Court Filing Fee, by Tyrone Powell Young. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to pay filing fee signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/24/2022. 30-Day Deadline. (Lundstrom, T)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Order served on Tyrone Powell Young. (Lundstrom, T)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION Requesting EXTENSION OF TIME to Pay Filing Fee to United States District Court Eastern District (Fresno Division) by Tyrone Powell Young. (Lawrence, A)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING #10 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/19/2022. Filing Fee due within twenty-one (21) days. (Lawrence, A)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations served on Tyrone Powell Young. (Lawrence, A)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OBJECTIONS to #10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Plaintiff Tyrone Powell Young. (Maldonado, C)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OBJECTIONS to #10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Plaintiff Tyrone Powell Young. (Flores, E)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be Denied; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign District Judge to Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/28/2022. Referred to Judge Thurston. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen-days. (Maldonado, C)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is: 1:22-cv-01219-JLT-BAM. (Maldonado, C)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Tyrone Powell Young. (Maldonado, C)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Findings and Recommendations 9 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Tyrone Powell Young. (Maldonado, C)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lundstrom, T)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Tyrone Powell Young, CDCR No. B-96021 to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in.pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Marrujo, C)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *9/19/2022*. Consent or Decline due by 10/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Huang, H)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:22-cv-1646-AC) to Fresno (1:22-cv-1219-BAM) signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/26/2022. (Huang, H)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, and #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Tyrone Powell Young. (Huang, H)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *9/19/2022*. Consent or Decline due by 10/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Spichka, K.)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Tyrone Powell Young. (Spichka, K.)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Tyrone Powell Young. (Spichka, K.)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against J. Cabrera, Chief Medical Officer, Ken Clark, G. Cortez, J. Flores, Galleger, M. Gamboa, G. Garza, A. Loza, L. Padrnos, J. Perez, A. Randolph, M. Rodriguez and J. Webb by Tyrone Powell Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Spichka, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Young v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Powell Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Gamboa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galleger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Randolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Cortez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Loza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Medical Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Padrnos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?