(PC) Singh v. Pheiffer, et al.
Plaintiff: Michael Manjeet Singh
Defendant: Warden Pheiffer, Captain, Lieutenant, Sergeant, Veith, Fowler and Diaz
Case Number: 1:2022cv01412
Filed: November 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Ana de Alba
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING #10 Motion to Proceed IFP as moot; ORDER VACATING #24 Findings and Recommendations, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/19/2022. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #25 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, Findings and Recommendations (Order) served on Michael Manjeet Singh. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE100051746 $402.00 fbo Michael Singh T22165 by State of California on 12/5/2022. (Lundstrom, T)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis be denied, and Plaintiff be directed to pay the $402.00 filing fee in full if he wants to proceed with this action re #20 Case Transferred In - District Transfer ; referred to Judge Ana de Alba; new case number 1:22-cv-1412 ADA-EPG (PC), signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/7/2022. ( Objections to F&R due within 21-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #24 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Michael Manjeet Singh. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Michael Manjeet Singh. (Maldonado, C)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Michael Manjeet Singh, CDCR No. T22165 to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in.pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Rivera, O)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Rivera, O)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:22-cv-02393.
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER VACATING DISMISSAL AND JUDGMENT; REOPENING CASE; OF TRANSFER. this case is TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of California, which is the proper venue for this case. Ruling on Plaintiffs IFP motion is deferred to the Eastern District. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 2, 2022. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 11/2/2022 (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 11/2/2022.]
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #21 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Michael Manjeet Singh. (Rivera, O)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Letter dated 9/15/2022 from Michael Manjeet Singh. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2022) [Transferred from cand on 11/2/2022.]
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Letter dated 8/3/2022 from Michael Singh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2022) [Transferred from cand on 11/2/2022.]
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Manjeet Singh.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2022) [Transferred from cand on 11/2/2022.]
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Captain, Diaz, Fowler, Lieutenant, Pheiffer, Sergeant, Veith. Filed by Michael Manjeet Singh. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2022) [Transferred from cand on 11/2/2022.]
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 EXHIBITS of Administratively exhausted grievances filed by Michael Manjeet Singh. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2022) [Transferred from cand on 11/2/2022.]
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Prisoner Statement of Account. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2022) [Transferred from cand on 11/2/2022.]
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Letter from Michael Manjeet Singh. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2022) [Transferred from cand on 11/2/2022.]
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Manjeet Singh. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2022) [Transferred from cand on 11/2/2022.]
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Manjeet Singh, CDCR # T22165.The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2022) [Transferred from cand on 11/2/2022.]
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 COMPLAINT on Form against Captain, Diaz, Fowler, Lieutenant, Pheiffer, Sergeant, Veith. Filed by Michael Manjeet Singh. Consent/Declination due by 6/10/2022. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2022) . [Transferred from cand on 11/2/2022.]
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 23, 2022. ***Civil Case Terminated. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 11/2/2022.]
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 23, 2022. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 11/2/2022.]
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 05/18/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 11/2/2022.]
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 11/2/2022.]
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Complaint on Form due by 5/26/2022. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 11/2/2022.]
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 5/26/2022. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 11/2/2022.]
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 11/2/2022.]
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Letter from Michael Singh. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2022) [Transferred from cand on 11/2/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Singh v. Pheiffer, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Manjeet Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Pheiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?