(PC) Tompkins v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Marshall Tompkins
Defendant: S Thomas, C. Layshot, M. Muro, E. Salazar, J. Mitchell, J. Velazquez, R. Gonzalez and S. Thomas
Case Number: 1:2022cv01415
Filed: October 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF INTENT TO WAIVE SERVICE by defendant(s) S. Thomas, C. Layshot, M. Muro, E. Salazar J. Mitchell, J. Velasquez R. Gonzalez. AG Waiver of Service due in 30 days. (Sant Agata, S)
November 30, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *R. Gonzalez, J. Mitchell, J. Velazquez* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Shawn Marshall Tompkins, BL-7280* *CHCF Stockton* *7707 Austin Rd.* *Stockton, CA 95215*. (Rivera, O)
November 30, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *C. Layshot, M. Muro, E. Salazar, S. Thomas* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Shawn Marshall Tompkins, BL-7280* *CHCF Stockton* *7707 Austin Rd.* *Stockton, CA 95215*. (Rivera, O)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FINDING SERVICE OF COMPLAINT APPROPRIATE AND DIRECTING SERVICE on the following defendants: *S. Thomas*, *C. Layshot*, *M. Muro*, *E. Salazar*, *J. Mitchell*, *J. Velazquez*, *R. Gonzalez*, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/29/2022. Operative Complaint, Summons, Notice of E-Service Waiver and this Order served via email on CDCR. (Attachments: #1 CDCR Notice of Waiver) (Rivera, O)
November 30, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order Finding Service of Complaint Appropriate served on Shawn Marshall Tompkins. (Rivera, O)
November 28, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE to the Court re #9 Screening Order by Shawn Marshall Tompkins. (Rivera, O)
November 21, 2022 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rivera, O)
November 21, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to CHCF Stockton, 7707 Austin Rd, Stockton, CA 95215 by Shawn Marshall Tompkins. (Rivera, O)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCREENING ORDER; ORDER Allowing Plaintiff's Complaint to Proceed on his Eighth Amendment Excessive Force Claims Against Defendants Thomas, Layshot, Muro, Salazar, Mitchell, Velazquez, and Gonzalez; ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Notice Indicating Date of Alleged Excessive Force Incident Within Twenty-One Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/10/2022. Twenty-One Day Deadline. (Maldonado, C)
November 14, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Screening Order served on Shawn Marshall Tompkins. (Maldonado, C)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/04/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Flores, E)
November 4, 2022 Filing 7 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Shawn Marshall Tompkins. (Flores, E)
November 4, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Shawn Marshall Tompkins. (Flores, E)
November 3, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Shawn Marshall Tompkins, CDCR No. BL-7280 to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in.pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Rivera, O)
November 3, 2022 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *10/31/2022*. Consent or Decline due by 12/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Huang, H)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:22-cv-1964-JDP) to Fresno (1:22-cv-1415-EPG) signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 11/3/2022. (Huang, H)
November 3, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Transfer Order and #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Shawn Marshall Tompkins. (Huang, H)
November 1, 2022 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *10/31/2022*. Consent or Decline due by 12/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Woodworth, M.)
November 1, 2022 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Shawn Marshall Tompkins. (Woodworth, M.)
October 31, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Shawn Marshall Tompkins. (Woodworth, M.)
October 31, 2022 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Shawn Marshall Tompkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woodworth, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Tompkins v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Marshall Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Layshot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Muro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Velazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?