(PC) Spencer v. Fernandez, et al.
Plaintiff: Edward B. Spencer
Defendant: M Fernandez, CDCR and N. Hernandez
Case Number: 1:2023cv00397
Filed: March 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Ana de Alba
Referring Judge: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 4/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Sant Agata, S)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Edward B. Spencer. (Sant Agata, S)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY): This case has been assigned to District Judge Ana de Alba and Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. The new case number is: 1:23-cv-00397-ADA-HBK (PC). (Lawrence, A)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lawrence, A)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE to Court re Incorrect Defendant Name by Edward B. Spencer. (Lawrence, A)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 9 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Edward B. Spencer. (Lawrence, A)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Edward B. Spencer. (Lawrence, A)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on SATF.Filings@cdcr.ca.gov. (Lundstrom, T)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *3/17/2023*. Consent or Decline due by 4/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Lundstrom, T)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Edward B. Spencer, CDCR No. F-32221 to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in.pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Lundstrom, T)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Edward B. Spencer. (Lundstrom, T)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against CDCR, M Fernandez by Edward B. Spencer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Spencer v. Fernandez, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward B. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?