(HC)Thomas v. Newsom et al
Defendant: Scott Degough and Heather Shirley
Petitioner: Prentice Ray Thomas
Respondent: Gavin Newsom and State of California
Case Number: 1:2023cv00489
Filed: March 31, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Christopher D Baker
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Petition for Lack of Jurisdiction; ORDER DENYING Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 05/22/2023. Referred to Judge Thurston. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen-Days. (Maldonado, C)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Prentice Ray Thomas. (Maldonado, C)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to 3250 West Lower Buckeye Road, Phoenix, AZ 85009 by Prentice Ray Thomas. (Marrujo, C)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Prentice Ray Thomas. (Lundstrom, T)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Gavin Newsom, Scott Degough, Heather Shirley by Prentice Ray Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lundstrom, T)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston and Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. The new case number is: 1:23-cv-00489-JLT-CDB-HC. (Lundstrom, T)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lundstrom, T)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Prentice Ray Thomas. (Lundstrom, T)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 5/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sant Agata, S)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Prentice Ray Thomas signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 3/31/2023. (Sant Agata, S)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Gavin Newsom, State of California by Prentice Ray Thomas.(Sant Agata, S)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Order Authorizing IFP Status, #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Prentice Ray Thomas. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC)Thomas v. Newsom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Prentice Ray Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Degough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Shirley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?