(PC)Jones v. Wasco State Prison et al
Plaintiff: Wayne E. Jones
Defendant: Wasco State Prison, Night Duty Tower Officer, Gonzelas, Hayes and Baker
Case Number: 1:2023cv00543
Filed: April 6, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Construing Complaint of Judicial Misconduct as a Motion and Denying as Moot signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/25/2023. (Lawrence, A)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order served on Wayne E. Jones. (Lawrence, A)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE RE Complaint of Judicial Misconduct or Disability by Wayne E. Jones. (Sant Agata, S)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Maldonado, C)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Wayne E. Jones. (Maldonado, C)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Wayne E. Jones. (Maldonado, C)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Wayne E. Jones, CDCR No. BU-7712 to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in.pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Maldonado, C)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Wayne E. Jones. (Maldonado, C)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Maldonado, C)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee within 45 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/07/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application Form)(Flores, E)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order served on Wayne E. Jones. (Flores, E)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 5/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:23-cv-00608.
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case transferred to District of Eastern District of California. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Eastern District of CalifornIa*.*501 I Street, Room 4-200**Sacramento, CA 95814*. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/6/23. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aas) [Transferred from casd on 4/6/2023.]
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Wayne E. Jones. (Sant Agata, S)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Baker, Gonzelas, Hayes, Night Duty Tower Officer, Wasco State Prison (Filing fee $ 402, fee not paid, IFP not filed.), filed by Wayne E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:23-cv-608-MMA-BGS. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (smy1) [Transferred from casd on 4/6/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)Jones v. Wasco State Prison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wasco State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Night Duty Tower Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzelas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?