(PC) McElroy v. Castro et al
Plaintiff: Latwahn McElroy
Defendant: Castro, Lamarque, Department of Corrections and Acosta
Case Number: 1:2023cv00559
Filed: April 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OBJECTIONS to #6 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Plaintiff Latwahn McElroy. (Maldonado, C)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING #9 Plaintiff's Request for the Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 05/25/2023. (Maldonado, C)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel served on Latwahn McElroy. (Maldonado, C)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST for Order to APPOINT COUNSEL by Latwahn McElroy. (Maldonado, C)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time within which to File Objections to Findings and Recommendations signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 05/01/2023. Objections to F&R due within Thirty-Days. (Flores, E)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order on Motion for Extension of Time served on Latwahn McElroy. (Flores, E)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME by Latwahn McElroy. (Lundstrom, T)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to deny Application to proceed IFP #4 ; Clerk of Court to assign District Judge signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/21/2023. Referred to Judge Jennifer L Thurston; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston and Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The new case number is: 1:23-cv-00559-JLT-SKO-PC. (Lundstrom, T)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), 5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Latwahn McElroy. (Lundstrom, T)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Latwahn McElroy. (Maldonado, C)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Rivera, O)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Latwahn McElroy. (Rivera, O)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Rivera, O)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Acosta, Castro, Department of Corrections, Lamarque by Latwahn McElroy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rivera, O)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Latwahn McElroy. (Rivera, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) McElroy v. Castro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latwahn McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamarque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?