(PC) Neill v. Clendenin, et al.
Plaintiff: Patrick Michael Neill and Patrick Neill
Defendant: Stephanie Clendenin, Michelle Mudgett, Natalie Sanders and Victor Alvarez
Case Number: 1:2023cv00901
Filed: June 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Ana de Alba
Referring Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign a District Judge to this Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of #1 Action for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/4/2023. Referred to Judge Ana de Alba. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen (14) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Ana de Alba and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is: 1:23-cv-00901-ADA-SAB(PC). (Sant Agata, S)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Patrick Neill. (Sant Agata, S)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Xiong, J.)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Plaintiff's Prisoner ID UPDATED to 3063-5. (Rivera, O)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/16/2023. (Rivera, O)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Patrick Neill. (Rivera, O)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Patrick Michael Neill. (Rivera, O)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Rivera, O)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Patrick Michael Neill. (Rivera, O)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Victor Alvarez, Stephanie Clendenin, Michelle Mudgett, Natalie Sanders by Patrick Michael Neill. (Rivera, O)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Patrick Michael Neill. (Rivera, O)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Rivera, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Neill v. Clendenin, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Michael Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Clendenin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Mudgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?