(PC) Allen v. Clendenin, et al.
Plaintiff: David Allen
Defendant: Stephanie Clendenin and Brandon Price
Case Number: 1:2023cv00921
Filed: June 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCREENING ORDER; ORDER for Plaintiff to File a First Amended Complaint or Notify the Court that he Wants to Stand on his Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 08/14/2023. First Amended Complaint due within Thirty-Days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(Maldonado, C)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Screening Order, served on David Allen. (Maldonado, C)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Xiong, J.)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/21/2023. (Rivera, O)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on David Allen. (Rivera, O)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Rivera, O)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by David Allen. (Rivera, O)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Stephanie Clendenin, Brandon Price by David Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rivera, O)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Rivera, O)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on David Allen. (Rivera, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Allen v. Clendenin, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Clendenin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?