(PC)Hooker v. Clendenin et al
Plaintiff: Cameron Hooker
Defendant: Stephanie Clendenin and Brandon Price
Case Number: 1:2023cv00969
Filed: June 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCREENING ORDER; ORDER for Plaintiff to (1) File a First Amended Complaint; or (2) Notify the Court that he Wants to Stand on his First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/17/2023. First Amended Complaint or Notice due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form) (Rivera, O)
August 17, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Screening Order served on Cameron Hooker. (Rivera, O)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 07/19/2023. (Flores, E)
July 19, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Cameron Hooker. (Flores, E)
July 18, 2023 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Xiong, J.)
July 17, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Cameron Hooker. (Xiong, J.)
July 17, 2023 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Xiong, J.)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SUBMIT a Non-Prisoner Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or PAY the $402.00 Filing Fee within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Non-Prisoner IFP Form)(Sant Agata, S)
June 29, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, served on Cameron Hooker. (Sant Agata, S)
June 28, 2023 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 7/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
June 28, 2023 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Stephanie Clendenin, Brandon Price by Cameron Hooker.(Sant Agata, S)
June 28, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint served on Cameron Hooker. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)Hooker v. Clendenin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Hooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Clendenin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?