(PC) Braden v. Fresno County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Cory Lee Braden
Defendant: Fresno County Sheriff's Department and Central California Private Security
Case Number: 1:2023cv01155
Filed: August 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Cory Lee Braden.(Flores, E)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCREENING ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File an Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/23/2023. First Amended Complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form). (Lawrence, A)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Screening Order served on Cory Lee Braden. (Lawrence, A)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to Fresno County Jail (same address, no changes) by Cory Lee Braden. (Marrujo, C)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Marrujo, C)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and ORDER DIRECTING Payment of Inmate Filing Fee by the Fresno County Sheriff, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Rivera, O)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Cory Lee Braden.SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Fresno County Sheriff located at P.O. Box 872, Fresno, CA 93712. (Rivera, O)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due within 30 days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Xiong, J.)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Cory Lee Braden. (Xiong, J.)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983)PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Central California Private Security, Fresno County Sheriff's Department by Cory Lee Braden.(Xiong, J.)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Cory Lee Braden. (Xiong, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Braden v. Fresno County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Lee Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central California Private Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?