The United States of America v. Salazar et al
Plaintiff: The United States of America and United States of America
Defendant: Javier Salazar, Jr., Juvenal Salazar, Javier Salazar, Sr. and Ricardo Covarrubias
Case Number: 1:2023cv01282
Filed: August 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Christopher D Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2023 Filing 5 EX PARTE APPLICATION by United States of America for Continuance of Scheduling Conference. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shikari, Roshni)
August 30, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ricardo Covarrubias, Javier Salazar, Sr, Javier Salazar, Jr* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Roshni Shikari* *U.S. Department of Justice* *950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. - 4CON* *Washington, DC 20530*. (Flores, E)
August 28, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2023 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield (CDB) before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A(m), #2 Worksheet, #3 Order re Consent, #4 VDRP) (Xiong, J.)
August 28, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ricardo Covarrubias, Javier Salazar, Sr, Javier Salazar, Jr* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Roshni Shikari* *DOJ-Crt* *150 M St NE* *Washington, DC 20002*. (Xiong, J.)
August 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shikari, Roshni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States of America v. Salazar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Salazar, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juvenal Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Salazar, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Covarrubias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States of America
Represented By: Roshni Shikari
Represented By: Robert Anthony Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Roshni Shikari
Represented By: Robert Anthony Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?