(PC) Graham v. State of California, et al.
Plaintiff: Crystal Graham
Defendant: State of California, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), Greg Rodriguez and Michael Pallares
Case Number: 1:2023cv01323
Filed: September 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER VACATING #5 Findings and Recommendations Regarding Dismissal of Action for Failure to Obey a Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/3/2023. (Marrujo, C)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number ACAEDC-11161039 for $402.00 Filing Fee on behalf of Plaintiff Crystal Graham from Joseph A. Virgilio. (Gonzalez, R)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #5 by Plaintiff Crystal Graham. (Virgilio, Joseph)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Action for Failure to Obey a Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/18/2023. Referred to Judge Thurston. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen-Days. (Maldonado, C)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SUBMIT Completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or PAY Filing Fee within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(Sant Agata, S)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Xiong, J.)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Crystal Graham. (Virgilio, Joseph)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Crystal Graham (Virgilio, Joseph)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Crystal Graham.(Virgilio, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Graham v. State of California, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Graham
Represented By: Joseph A. Virgilio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pallares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?