Herrera v. Olam Americas, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donna Herrera
Defendant: Olam Americas, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01402
Filed: September 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Christopher D Baker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on #6 Stipulation to Enlarge Time for Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 10/16/2023. Scheduling Conference reset for 1/31/2024 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield (CDB) before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. (Hall, S)
October 11, 2023 Filing 6 STIPULATION To Enlarge Time For Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Donna Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Enlarge Time For Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Hefelfinger, Brian)
October 9, 2023 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Hefelfinger, Brian)
September 29, 2023 Filing 4 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Donna Herrera. (Hefelfinger, Brian)
September 26, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2023 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield (CDB) before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A(m), #2 Worksheet, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Xiong, J.)
September 26, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Olam Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Farmer, Douglas)
September 26, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV-22-101987 by Donna Herrera. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-11097186) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Kaci Carvalho, #3 Proof of Service)(Farmer, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrera v. Olam Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Herrera
Represented By: Brian D Hefelfinger, Hefel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olam Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas J. Farmer
Represented By: Jade Butman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?