(PC) Bazzo v. State of California et al
Plaintiff: Frank Monaco Bazzo
Defendant: State of California, CDCR, Kathleen Allison, Neil McDowell, A Baer, V. Alvarez and M. Shaw
Case Number: 1:2023cv01454
Filed: October 11, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: No District Court Judge
Referring Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the elevation of U.S. District Judge Ana I. de Alba to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, the court finds it necessary to temporarily reassign this case to No District Court Judge (NODJ) until a new district judge is appointed. (Sant Agata, S)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order Reassigning No District Court Judge (NODJ), served on Frank Monaco Bazzo. (Sant Agata, S)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #11 (titled Reply to Motion to Proceed IFP Denial) by Plaintiff Frank Monaco Bazzo. (Marrujo, C)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign a District Judge to This Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending #9 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Be Denied re #1 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/25/2023. Referred to Judge de Alba. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Xiong, J.)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Ana de Alba and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is: 1:23-cv-01454-ADA-SAB (PC). (Xiong, J.)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 10 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, #11 Findings and Recommendations served on Frank Monaco Bazzo. (Xiong, J.)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Frank Monaco Bazzo. (Lundstrom, T)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Maldonado, C)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/12/2023. Application for IFP or Filing Fee due within 45 days. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(Xiong, J.)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order served on Frank Monaco Bazzo. (Xiong, J.)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due within 30 days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Xiong, J.)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:23-cv-01707.
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Frank Monaco Bazzo. (Xiong, J.)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case transferred to District of Eastern District of California. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Eastern District of California*.*501 "i" Street**Sacramento, CA 95814*. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh) [Transferred from casd on 10/11/2023.]
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Frank Monaco Bazzo. (bdc) [Transferred from casd on 10/11/2023.]
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frank Monaco Bazzo. (bdc)(sjt). [Transferred from casd on 10/11/2023.]
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kathleen Allison, V. Alvarez, A. Baer, CDCR, Neil McDowell, M. Shaw, State of California (Filing fee $ 402, Fee Not Paid. IFP Filed.), filed by Frank Monaco Bazzo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit List and Exhibits A-C, #3 Exhibits D-G)The new case number is 3:23-cv-1707-CAB-KSC. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (bdc) (sjt).[Transferred from casd on 10/11/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Bazzo v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Monaco Bazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?