Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Molina et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Concepcion Flores Molina and Lupe C. Nunes
Case Number: 1:2023cv01553
Filed: November 2, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: No District Court Judge
Referring Judge: Ana de Alba
2 Judge: Christopher D Baker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Concepcion Flores Molina on 11/8/2023, Answer due 1/8/2024 (Tsui, Karen)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Lupe C. Nunes on 11/8/2023, Answer due 1/8/2024 (Tsui, Karen)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the elevation of U.S. District Judge Ana I. de Alba to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, the court finds it necessary to temporarily reassign this case to No District Court Judge (NODJ) until a new district judge is appointed. (Nguyen, J)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2024 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield (CDB) before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Worksheet, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Xiong, J.)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Concepcion Flores Molina, Lupe C. Nunes* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Karen T. Tsui* *Maynard Nexsen LLP* *10100 Santa Monica Boulevard, Ste 550* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Xiong, J.)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Tsui, Karen)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT --- Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Complaint-in-Interpleader --- against Concepcion Flores Molina, Lupe C. Nunes by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Attorney Tsui, Karen T. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-11165995) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Interested Parties)(Tsui, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Molina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Misty A. Murray
Represented By: Karen T. Tsui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concepcion Flores Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupe C. Nunes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?