(SS) Sigala v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Joel Sigala
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2023cv01651
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF LODGING SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Lodge, Jeffrey James added. (Attachments: #1 Complete Certified Administrative Record, #2 Supplemental Certified Administrative Record, #3 Administrative Record in OCR Format, #4 Supplemental Administrative Record in OCR Format)(Lodge, Jeffrey)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston and Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. The new case number is: 1:23-cv-01651-JLT-GSA. (Marrujo, C)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Martin, Justin)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Justin Lane Martin, GOVT for Commissioner of Social Security, attorney Social Security Admin- SS E-Service and US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service terminated (Martin, Justin)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Social Security Complaint, #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 Summons, #5 Social Security New Case Documents for MJ as Presider served on Commissioner of Social Security. (Lawrence, A)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL: Consent or Decline due by 3/7/2024. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Lawrence, A)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare St., Suite320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Lawrence, A)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/5/2023. (Lawrence, A)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Lawrence, A)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Joel Sigala. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Joel Sigala. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Sigala v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Sigala
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Represented By: Justin Lane Martin, GOVT
Represented By: Jeffrey James Lodge, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?