(PC) Youngblood v. Tutomer et al
Plaintiff: Jesse L. Youngblood
Defendant: Tutomer, Suma and Bernal Flores
Case Number: 1:2024cv00013
Filed: January 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: No District Court Judge
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OBJECTIONS to #8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Plaintiff Jesse L. Youngblood. (Rivera, O)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign District Judge to Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/9/2024. Referred to Judge NODJ. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen (14) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to No District Court Judge and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is: 1:24-cv-00013-NODJ-BAM(PC). (Sant Agata, S)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, #8 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Jesse L. Youngblood. (Sant Agata, S)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Jesse L. Youngblood. (Maldonado, C)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on CSP-Corcoran. (Maldonado, C)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *1/4/2023*. Consent or Decline due by 2/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Maldonado, C)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Jesse L. Youngblood, CDCR No. H-60800 to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in.pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Maldonado, C)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jesse L. Youngblood. (Maldonado, C)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Bernal Flores, Suma, Tutomer by Jesse L. Youngblood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Youngblood v. Tutomer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse L. Youngblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tutomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernal Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?