(PC) Alexander v. Muscteman et al
Plaintiff: Julian J. Alexander
Defendant: Muscteman, Pangtoia, Barrajas and Garcia
Case Number: 1:2024cv00089
Filed: January 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION Requesting to Correct Defendant's Name, by Julian J. Alexander. (Marrujo, C)
February 16, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to P.O. Box 8101, San Luis Obispo, CA 93409 by Julian J. Alexander. (Marrujo, C)
February 16, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Correct Defendants' name, by Julian J. Alexander. (Marrujo, C)
February 16, 2024 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Marrujo, C)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 01/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Flores, E)
January 25, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Julian J. Alexander. (Flores, E)
January 24, 2024 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Julian J. Alexander. (Flores, E)
January 19, 2024 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Julian J. Alexander, CDCR No. AM-7350 to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in.pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Xiong, J.)
January 19, 2024 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due within 30 days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Xiong, J.)
January 19, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Julian J. Alexander. (Xiong, J.)
January 19, 2024 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Barrajas, Garcia, Muscteman, Pangtoia by Julian J. Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Xiong, J.)
January 19, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Julian J. Alexander. (Xiong, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Alexander v. Muscteman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muscteman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pangtoia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrajas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?