Phillips v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Nicholas Francis Phillips
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv00537
Filed: May 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on May 10, 2024. (Munoz, I)
May 8, 2024 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is: 1:24-cv-00537-JLT-SAB. (Rivera, O)
May 7, 2024 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by General Motors LLC. (Park, Steven)
May 7, 2024 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Park, Steven)
May 6, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A(m), #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Xiong, J.)
May 6, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Park, Steven)
May 6, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Madera County Superior Court, case number MCV091616 by Nicholas Francis Phillips. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11507578) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration of Eric Mitchell, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Park, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Francis Phillips
Represented By: Ryan K. Marden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: John R. Lawless, Jr.
Represented By: Vincent Frank Tremonti
Represented By: Steven D. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?