Valley Children's Hospital v. Grimmway Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Valley Children's Hospital
Defendant: Grimmway Enterprises, Inc. and Grimmway Enterprises, Inc. Administrative Group Welfare Plan
Case Number: 1:2024cv00643
Filed: May 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Christopher D Baker
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER on #10 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 7/24/2024. (Hall, S)
July 23, 2024 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to further extend the time for defendants to respond to complaint by 7 days by Grimmway Enterprises, Inc.. (Westerfeld, Bryan)
June 28, 2024 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint by 28 Days by Grimmway Enterprises, Inc., Grimmway Enterprises, Inc. Administrative Group Welfare Plan. Attorney Westerfeld, Bryan S. added. (Westerfeld, Bryan)
June 17, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Grimmway Enterprises, Inc. Administrative Group Welfare Plan served on 6/11/2024, answer due 7/2/2024. (Doerksen, Charles)
June 17, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Grimmway Enterprises, Inc. served on 6/11/2024, answer due 7/2/2024. (Doerksen, Charles)
May 31, 2024 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2024 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield (CDB) before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. (Attachments: #1 CDB Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
May 31, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Grimmway Enterprises, Inc., Grimmway Enterprises, Inc. Administrative Group Welfare Plan* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Charles Doerksen* *25920 Elwood Road* *Sanger, CA 93657*. (Sant Agata, S)
May 31, 2024 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Valley Children's Hospital (Doerksen, Charles)
May 31, 2024 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE to attorney, Charles Doerksen re #2 Civil Cover Sheet. Please re-submit the Civil Cover Sheet as the one filed is blank. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444. (Lundstrom, T)
May 30, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Valley Children's Hospital (Doerksen, Charles)
May 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of ERISA (Denial of Health Benefits) against All Defendants by Valley Children's Hospital. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11554143) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement, #2 Exhibit Conditions of Admission)(Doerksen, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valley Children's Hospital v. Grimmway Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grimmway Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan S. Westerfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grimmway Enterprises, Inc. Administrative Group Welfare Plan
Represented By: Bryan S. Westerfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Children's Hospital
Represented By: Charles Doerksen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?