(PC) Mrozek v. Eaton et al
Plaintiff: Bradley James Mrozek
Defendant: Patrick Eaton, Ron Broomfield and T. Ismans
Case Number: 1:2024cv00664
Filed: June 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2024 Filing 10 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 7/11/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
June 6, 2024 Filing 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:24-cv-03324.
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/6/2024. The Clerk of the Court shall transfer this matter forthwith. In light of this transfer, the Court defers to the Eastern District for ruling on the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and the motion for a temporary restraining order. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 6/6/2024.]
June 6, 2024 Remark: ECF #8 mailed to Petitioner on June 6, 2024. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/6/2024.]
June 6, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Bradley James Mrozek. (Maldonado, C)
June 4, 2024 Filing 7 Proposed Order re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Bradley James Mrozek. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/6/2024.]
June 3, 2024 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 7/11/2024. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2024) Plaintiff has been served by Email (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 6/6/2024.]
June 3, 2024 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/6/2024.]
June 3, 2024 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bradley James Mrozek. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/6/2024.]
June 3, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Bradley James Mrozek. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/6/2024.]
June 3, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Bradley James Mrozek. (page 2 not submitted) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/6/2024.]
June 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ron Broomfield, John or Jane Doe 1-20, Patrick Eaton, T. Ismans. Filed by Bradley James Mrozek. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/6/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Mrozek v. Eaton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley James Mrozek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Broomfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Ismans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?