(HC)Perlaza v. Warden
Petitioner: Ruben Dario Perlaza
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 1:2024cv00693
Filed: June 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2024 Filing 10 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 7/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Ruben Dario Perlaza signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/13/2024. (Sant Agata, S)
June 13, 2024 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:24-cv-00760.
June 13, 2024 Filing 7 Case transferred to District of Eastern District of California. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Eastern District of California*.*501 I St. #4200**Sacramento, CA 95814*. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/13/2024. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh) [Transferred from casd on 6/13/2024.]
June 13, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order Authorizing IFP Status, #10 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Ruben Dario Perlaza. (Sant Agata, S)
June 10, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE re: Payment by Ruben Dario Perlaza (bdc) [Transferred from casd on 6/13/2024.]
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER : (1) Denying Motion for Reconsideration [ECF no. #4 ]; and (2) Granting Extension of Time to File In Forma Pauperis Application or Pay Filing Fee. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/3/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(IFP with affidavit mailed with Order)(anh) [Transferred from casd on 6/13/2024.]
May 30, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Reconsideration re #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ruben Dario Perlaza. (bdc) [Transferred from casd on 6/13/2024.]
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Denying In Forma Pauperis Application and Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/30/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh) [Transferred from casd on 6/13/2024.]
April 22, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ruben Dario Perlaza. (bdc) [Transferred from casd on 6/13/2024.]
April 22, 2024 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Warden (Filing fee $ 5, Fee Not Paid, IFP filed.), filed by Ruben Dario Perlaza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Memorandum of Law)The new case number is 3:24-cv-760-CAB-AHG. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case.(bdc) [Transferred from casd on 6/13/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC)Perlaza v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ruben Dario Perlaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?