(PC) DePonte v. Stohl et al
Plaintiff: David Arthur DePonte
Defendant: Stohl, Stern, J Saucedo, K. Sudano, M. Dobe and Gunsaga
Case Number: 1:2024cv00695
Filed: June 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2024 Filing 21 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 7/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Flores, E)
June 13, 2024 Filing 20 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:24-cv-01416.
June 13, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #21 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on David Arthur DePonte. (Flores, E)
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros on 6/12/2024. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 6/13/2024.]
June 12, 2024 *** Case electronically transferred to the USDC Eastern District of California. *** (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/13/2024.]
May 15, 2024 Filing 18 Letter from David DePonte. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/13/2024.]
May 8, 2024 Filing 16 Letter from Plaintiff regarding Case Status and Defendant Names (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/13/2024.]
May 1, 2024 Filing 17 ***ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED - DUPLICATE, DISREGARD SEE DOC #13 *** MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by David Arthur DePonte. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2024) Modified on 5/15/2024 (far, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 6/13/2024.]
May 1, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to place all exhibits on record filed by David Arthur DePonte. Responses due by 5/29/2024. Replies due by 6/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/13/2024.]
May 1, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by David Arthur DePonte. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/13/2024.]
May 1, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by David Arthur DePonte. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/13/2024.]
April 17, 2024 Filing 12 Letter from David Arthur DePonte. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/13/2024.]
April 1, 2024 Filing 11 Letter from David Arthur DePonte. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/13/2024.]
March 27, 2024 Filing 10 Letter from David A. DePonte. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/13/2024.]
March 22, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to place exhibits as prima faci evidence filed by David Arthur DePonte. Responses due by 4/19/2024. Replies due by 5/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/13/2024.]
March 20, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Arthur DePonte.. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/13/2024.]
March 20, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Arthur DePonte. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/13/2024.]
March 20, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by David Arthur DePonte (docket updated) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/13/2024.]
March 11, 2024 Filing 5 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by David Arthur DePonte. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/13/2024.]
March 11, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 6/13/2024.]
March 8, 2024 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 4/15/2024. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 6/13/2024.]
March 8, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Arthur DePonte, CDCR # T-43638.PLEASE DISREGARD these instructions sent to CDCR in error.The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2024) Modified on 3/11/2024 (ljf, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 6/13/2024.]
March 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M. Dobe, Gunsaga, J. Saucedo, Stern, Stohl, K. Sudano. Filed by David Arthur DePonte. Consent/Declination due by 4/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/13/2024.]
March 8, 2024 Changed plaintiff's mailing address from CSATF's physical address to the post office box for Facility G. (ljf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2024) [Transferred from cand on 6/13/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) DePonte v. Stohl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Arthur DePonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Saucedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Sudano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Dobe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gunsaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?