(PC) Smith v. Clendenin et al
Plaintiff: David Junior Smith
Defendant: Brandon Price and Stephanie Clendenin
Case Number: 1:2024cv00791
Filed: July 1, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2024 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lawrence, A)
July 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 07/10/2024. (Flores, E)
July 11, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on David Junior Smith. (Flores, E)
July 9, 2024 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 8/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Huang, H)
July 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:24-cv-1835 CSK) to Fresno (1:24-cv-0791 SKO) signed by Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 7/8/2024. (Huang, H)
July 9, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Transfer Order and #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, served on David Junior Smith. (Huang, H)
July 3, 2024 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on David Junior Smith, with ID Number. (Huang, H)
July 2, 2024 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 8/5/2024. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Kastilahn, A)
July 2, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on David Junior Smith. (Kastilahn, A)
July 1, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by David Junior Smith. (Kastilahn, A)
July 1, 2024 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by David Junior Smith. (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Smith v. Clendenin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Junior Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Clendenin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?