Ri'Chard v. Only What You Need, Inc.
Plaintiff: Latanya Ri'Chard
Defendant: Only What You Need, Inc. Doing business as Owyn
Case Number: 1:2024cv01051
Filed: September 4, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2024 Filing 18 ANSWER by Only What You Need, Inc.. (Kwasniewski, David)
December 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/9/2024: Given the Defendant's responsive pleading due date of December 12, 2024 (see Doc. #11 ), the Mandatory Scheduling Conference is hereby CONTINUED to January 23, 2025, at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall file their joint scheduling report by no later than seven (7) days prior to the Conference. In addition to the joint scheduling report, the parties are to return the consent to assignment or request for reassignment form (Doc. #3 -2), attached to the Court's September 4, 2024 Order re Consent or Request for Reassignment (Doc. #3 -1), by no later than seven (7) days prior to the Conference. (Kusamura, W)
December 2, 2024 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Only What You Need, Inc.. (Kwasniewski, David)
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #12 Application for Pro Hac Vice, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/22/2024. Added attorney Daniel C. Levin, PHV for Latanya Ri'Chard. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Maldonado, C)
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Application for Pro Hac Vice, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/22/2024. Added attorney Charles E. Schaffer, PHV for Latanya Ri'Chard. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Maldonado, C)
November 21, 2024 Filing 13 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Latanya Ri'Chard for attorney Charles E. Schaffer to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-11885130) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Mackey, Robert)
November 21, 2024 Filing 12 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Latanya Ri'Chard for attorney Daniel C. Levin to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number BCAEDC-11885090) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Mackey, Robert)
November 14, 2024 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (Joint) by Only What You Need, Inc.. Attorney Kwasniewski, David Howard added. (Kwasniewski, David)
October 24, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Only What You Need, Inc. served on 10/24/2024, answer due 11/14/2024. (Rihn, Daniel)
October 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Application for Pro Hac Vice, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/14/2024. Added attorney Nicholas Migliaccio, PHV for Latanya Ri'Chard. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Rivera, O)
October 10, 2024 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Latanya Ri'Chard for attorney Nicholas A. Migliaccio to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-11801886) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Mackey, Robert)
September 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #5 Application for Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/26/2024. Added attorney Sara J. Watkins, PHV for Only What You Need, Inc. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Xiong, J.)
September 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #4 Application for Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/26/2024. Added attorney Daniel Aaron Rihn, PHV for Only What You Need, Inc. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Xiong, J.)
September 25, 2024 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Latanya Ri'Chard for attorney Sara J. Watkins to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-11768384) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Mackey, Robert)
September 25, 2024 Filing 4 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Latanya Ri'Chard for attorney Daniel Aaron Rihn to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-11768383) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Mackey, Robert)
September 4, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2024 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A(m), #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Xiong, J.)
September 4, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Only What You Need, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robert Mackey* *16320 Murphy Road* *Sonora, CA 95370*. (Xiong, J.)
September 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Only What You Need, Inc. by Latanya Ri'Chard. Attorney Mackey, Robert added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mackey, Robert)
September 4, 2024 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11729241. (Mackey, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ri'Chard v. Only What You Need, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Only What You Need, Inc. Doing business as Owyn
Represented By: David Howard Kwasniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latanya Ri'Chard
Represented By: Robert Mackey
Represented By: Sara J. Watkins, PHV
Represented By: Sara J. Watkins, PHV
Represented By: Nicholas Migliaccio, PHV
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn, PHV
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn, PHV
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin, PHV
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin, PHV
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer, PHV
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?