(PC) Rosner v. Welpath, et al.
Plaintiff: Jessie Rosner
Defendant: Sean, Dr. Baker, Welpath and Eva
Case Number: 1:2024cv01145
Filed: September 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/21/2024. Amended Complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Lawrence, A)
November 21, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time served on Jessie Rosner. (Lawrence, A)
November 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to File an Amended Complaint by Jessie Rosner. (Lawrence, A)
November 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/5/2024. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Sant Agata, S)
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCREENING ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File an Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/31/2024. Amended Complaint due within Thirty-Days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form) (Maldonado, C)
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Screening Order served on Jessie Rosner. (Maldonado, C)
October 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jessie Rosner. (Lundstrom, T)
October 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lundstrom, T)
September 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to submit IFP Application or pay filing fee within 45-Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/30/2024. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Lundstrom, T)
September 30, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Jessie Rosner. (Lundstrom, T)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 10/31/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Jessie Rosner. (Lundstrom, T)
September 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jessie Rosner. (Lundstrom, T) .
September 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Baker, Eva, Sean, Welpath by Jessie Rosner. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Rosner v. Welpath, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welpath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?