(SS) Espinoza v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lupe Espinoza
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2024cv01259
Filed: October 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Referring Judge: Kirk E Sherriff
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2024 Filing 12 JUDGMENT dated *12/6/2024* pursuant to #11 order in favor of Plaintiff, Lupe Espinoza against Defendant, Commissioner of Social Security. (Sant Agata, S)
December 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER to Voluntary REMAND Pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. 405(G) signed by District Judge Kirk E. Sherriff on 12/6/2024. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
December 5, 2024 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Voluntary Remand to the Agency re #1 Social Security Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Martin, Justin)
December 5, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF LODGING SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Hall, Benjamin E. added. (Attachments: #1 Certification Page, #2 Court Transcript Index, #3 Documents Related to Administrative Process, #4 Payment Documents, #5 Jurisdictional Documents, #6 Non Disability Related Development, #7 Disability Related Development, #8 Medical Records Part 1, #9 Medical Records Part 2, #10 Medical Records Part 3, #11 Medical Records Part 4, #12 Medical Records Part 5, #13 Medical Records Part 6, #14 Medical Records Part 7) (Hall, Benjamin)
October 25, 2024 Filing 8 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Justin Lane Martin, GOVT for Commissioner of Social Security, attorney Social Security Admin- SS E-Service and US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service terminated (Martin, Justin)
October 25, 2024 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Kirk E. Sherriff and Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. The new case number is: 1:24-cv-01259-KES-GSA. (Maldonado, C)
October 24, 2024 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan)
October 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 1/27/2025. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
October 24, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *3467 W. Shaw Ave.* *Suite 100* *Fresno, CA 93711*. (Maldonado, C)
October 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Directing Clerk to Issue New Case Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/24/2024. (Maldonado, C)
October 16, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Lupe Espinoza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pena, Jonathan)
October 16, 2024 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Lupe Espinoza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pena, Jonathan)
October 16, 2024 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Xiong, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Espinoza v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lupe Espinoza
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Benjamin E. Hall, GOVT
Represented By: Justin Lane Martin, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?