Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Pederson et al
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Defendant: James Pederson, Jane Doe and Flyers Energy, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv01299
Filed: October 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Christopher D Baker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2024 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Flyers Energy, LLC. (Gerking, Tyler)
December 20, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Flyers Energy, LLC. Attorney Gerking, Tyler Churchill added. (Gerking, Tyler)
November 15, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Jane Doe served on 11/14/2024, answer due 12/5/2024. (Altman, Yevgenia)
November 14, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Safeco Insurance Company of America served on 11/13/2024, answer due 12/4/2024. (Daza, Patricia)
October 30, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Flyers Energy, LLC served on 10/30/2024, answer due 11/20/2024. (Daza, Patricia)
October 24, 2024 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2025 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield (CDB) before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A(m), #2 CDB Worksheet, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Maldonado, C)
October 24, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Jane Doe, Flyers Energy, LLC, James Pederson* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Patricia Ann Daza* *777 S. Figueroa Street* *Suite 750* *Los Angeles, CA 90017*. (Maldonado, C)
October 24, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Daza, Patricia)
October 24, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Daza, Patricia)
October 24, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants by Safeco Insurance Company of America. Attorney Daza, Patricia Ann added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11830883) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Safeco Quality-Plus Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Jane Doe's Complaint) (Daza, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Pederson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flyers Energy, LLC
Represented By: Tyler Churchill Gerking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Patricia Ann Daza
Represented By: Connor J. Tatooles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?