(PC) Ayers v. California Correctional Institution
Plaintiff: Bobby Ayers
Defendant: California Correctional Institution
Case Number: 1:2024cv01301
Filed: October 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2024 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by Bobby Ayers. (Maldonado, C)
November 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCREENING ORDER Finding Complaint Fails to State a Claim and Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint, Stand on Complaint, or File Voluntary Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 11/4/2024. November 29, 2024 Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form) (Marrujo, C)
November 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 11/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Marrujo, C)
November 4, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Bobby Ayers. (Marrujo, C)
November 4, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Screening Order, served on Bobby Ayers. (Marrujo, C)
October 29, 2024 Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Bobby Ayers. (Flores, E)
October 24, 2024 Filing 5 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on CSP-Corcoran. (Marrujo, C)
October 24, 2024 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Bobby Ayers, CDCR No. AS-1780 to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in.pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Marrujo, C)
October 24, 2024 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *10/24/2024*. Consent or Decline due by 11/29/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Marrujo, C)
October 24, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Bobby Ayers. (Marrujo, C)
October 24, 2024 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against California Correctional Institution by Bobby Ayers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Ayers v. California Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?