(SS) Flores v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Beatriz Flores
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2024cv01330
Filed: October 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE THE ELECTRONIC CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD AS THE ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/20/2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's response to Plaintiff's complaint shall be filed on or before January 29, 2025. All remaining deadlines as set forth in the scheduling order (ECF No. #5 ) shall be modified accordingly. (Nguyen, J)
December 19, 2024 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Social Security Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Martin, Justin)
November 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/8/2024: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 1:24-cv-01330-SAB (SS).. (Xiong, J.)
November 7, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Martin, Justin)
October 31, 2024 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan)
October 31, 2024 Filing 6 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 Summons, #5 Social Security New Case Documents for MJ as Presider, #1 Social Security Complaint served on US Attorney's Office and Social Security Admin. (Marrujo, C)
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 2/3/2025. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Marrujo, C)
October 31, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena and Bromberg, PC* *3467 W. Shaw Ave., Suite 100* *Fresno, CA 93711*. (Marrujo, C)
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Directing Clerk of Court to Issue Summons and Serve Defendant Under E-Service Program, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/31/2024. (Marrujo, C)
October 30, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Beatriz Flores. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pena, Jonathan)
October 30, 2024 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Beatriz Flores. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pena, Jonathan)
October 30, 2024 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Flores v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: Justin Lane Martin, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatriz Flores
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?