(PC) Williams v. Nocha et al
Plaintiff: Lance Williams
Defendant: E. Magallanes, A. Nocha and H. Florez
Case Number: 1:2024cv01506
Filed: December 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Christopher D Baker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief Extending Time to file Long Form Application to proceed IFP #10 signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 1/28/2025. (Deputy Clerk TEL)
January 28, 2025 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order served on Lance Williams. (Deputy Clerk TEL)
January 27, 2025 Filing 10 MOTION for 40-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File IFP Application by Lance Williams. (Deputy Clerk EF)
January 16, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER discharging Order to Show Cause #7 ; directing Plaintiff to file Long Form IFP Application #2 signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 1/16/2024. 21-Day Filing Deadline. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application (Long Form)). (Deputy Clerk TEL)
January 16, 2025 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order served on Lance Williams. (Deputy Clerk TEL)
January 15, 2025 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #7 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Lance Williams. (Deputy Clerk CM)
December 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed as Duplicative of Case Number 1:22-cv-00095-KES-SKO (PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 12/27/2024. Show Cause Response due within twenty-one (21) days. (Lawrence, A)
December 27, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order to Show Cause served on Lance Williams. (Lawrence, A)
December 18, 2024 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Flores, E)
December 12, 2024 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Flores, E)
December 11, 2024 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 1/13/2025. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Spichka, K.)
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 12/11/2024 TRANSFERRING CASE to the Fresno Division. New Case Number 1:24-cv-1506 CDB (PC). Old Case Number 2:24-cv-3388 CSK (PC). (Spichka, K.)
December 11, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Lance Williams. (Spichka, K.)
December 5, 2024 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 1/9/2025. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Licea Chavez, V)
December 5, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Lance Williams. (Licea Chavez, V)
December 3, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Lance Williams. (Licea Chavez, V)
December 3, 2024 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against H. Florez, E. Magallanes, A. Nocha by Lance Williams. (Licea Chavez, V)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Williams v. Nocha et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Magallanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Nocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Florez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?