John Roe RJ 50 v. Doe 1 et al
Plaintiff: John Roe RJ 50
Defendant: Doe 1, Doe 3, Does 4 to 100 and Doe 2
Case Number: 1:2024cv01545
Filed: December 17, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2025 Filing 12 OBJECTIONS by Defendant Doe 1 to #10 Reply. (Dale, Lisa)
February 13, 2025 Filing 11 NOTICE (Second) of New Authorities in Support of Doe 1's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Doe 1 re #8 Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Denying Remand, #2 Exhibit B - Order Denying Remand, #3 Exhibit C - Order Denying Remand)(Dale, Lisa)
February 10, 2025 Filing 10 REPLY by John Roe RJ 50 re #6 Motion to Remand,,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF LAUREN A. WELLING IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY, #2 Proof of Service)(Welling, Lauren)
February 7, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE of New Authority in support of Doe 1's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Doe 1 re #8 Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Denying Remand)(Trepanier, Lisa)
January 30, 2025 Filing 8 OPPOSITION by Doe 1 to #6 Motion to Remand,,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lisa Dearden Trepanier, #2 Exhibit A - John DZ Case, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 1 - California Secretary of State Business Search)(Trepanier, Lisa)
January 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) Pursuant to Local Rule 302, the filed motion to remand #6 will be heard and decided by the undersigned. As set forth in the Court's standing order, no hearing will be calendared, and the matter will be decided on the papers. As a result of the ongoing judicial resource emergency in this District, approximately 100 regular civil motions remain under submission before the undersigned. As a result, it is likely to be six or more months until the motion(s) in this matter is resolved. The Court reiterates that magistrate judge consent can alleviate the delay caused by the resource emergency. The parties SHALL reconsider magistrate judge consent for all purposes or only for this pending motion. In addition, the parties are reminded of their ongoing obligation to inform the Court of any changed circumstances that have rendered all or part of any pending motion moot. Finally, the parties are informed that the undersigned generally requires a formal settlement conference take place before any civil case proceeds to trial. Should the parties jointly wish to schedule a settlement conference, they are directed to contact Courtroom Deputy Irma Munoz at imunoz@caed.uscourts.gov signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on January 27, 2025. (Deputy Clerk IM)
January 16, 2025 Filing 6 MOTION to REMAND by John Roe RJ 50. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1: Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2: Excerpt from General Handbook, #5 Exhibit 3: Excerpt from General Handbook, #6 Exhibit 4: John Roe CL 11 Order Remanding Case, #7 Exhibit 5: Jane Roe KL 66 Order Remanding Case, #8 Exhibit 6: Jane Roe AH 71 Order Remanding Case, #9 Proposed Order, #10 Proof of Service)(Welling, Lauren)
December 20, 2024 Filing 5 SEALED EVENT. (Flores, E)
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Doe 1's #2 Request to File Evidence Identifying Plaintiff under Seal signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/19/2024. (Flores, E)
December 17, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2025 at 12:15 PM in Courtroom 2 (HBK) before Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Xiong, J.)
December 17, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lisa Dearden Trepanier, #2 Exhibit 1 - Redacted Dawson Decl & Exhs. A-G, #3 Stipulation to Seal Documents, #4 Proposed Order on Request to Seal Documents, #5 Proof of Service) (Trepanier, Lisa)
December 17, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno Superior Court, case number 24CECG03740 by John Roe RJ 50. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11930491) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lisa Dale, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - State Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit C - State Summons, #5 Exhibit D - Attorney Certificate of Merit Doe 1, #6 Exhibit E - Attorney Certificate of Merit Doe 2, #7 Exhibit F - Attorney Certificate of Merit Doe 3, #8 Exhibit G - Mental Health Practitioner Certificate of Merit, #9 Exhibit H - Notice of Case Assignment, #10 Exhibit I - Notice of Lodging, #11 Exhibit J - State Court Answer, #12 Exhibit K - Notice to Clerk, #13 Exhibit L - Notice to Adverse Party, #14 Declaration of Branden Wilson, #15 Exhibit A - California Foreign Registration, #16 Exhibit B - Utah Amended & Restated Articles, #17 Exhibit C - Gettysburg Deed, #18 Exhibit D - Bethel Deed, #19 Exhibit E - Temple Corp AOI, #20 Declaration of Adam Dawson (Redacted Public Version), #21 Exhibit A - Grant Deed (Redacted Public Version), #22 Exhibit B - TRO (Redacted Public Version), #23 Exhibit C - Complaint Against Plaintiff (Redacted Public Version), #24 Exhibit D - Minute Order (Redacted Public Version), #25 Exhibit E - Arrest Report (Redacted Public Version), #26 Exhibit F - Minute Order (Redacted Public Version), #27 Exhibit G - Minute Order (Redacted Public Version), #28 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #29 Civil Cover Sheet, #30 Request for Judicial Notice ISO Notice of Removal, #31 Proof of Service) (Trepanier, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Roe RJ 50 v. Doe 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 1
Represented By: Lisa Dearden Trepanier
Represented By: Lisa Marie Dale
Represented By: Gregory Evan Eisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 4 to 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 2
Represented By: Lisa Marie Dale
Represented By: Gregory Evan Eisner
Represented By: Lisa Dearden Trepanier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Roe RJ 50
Represented By: Sarah Kissel Meier
Represented By: Lauren Aliz Welling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?