(PC) McMillion v. Doer et al
Plaintiff: Skyler McMillion
Defendant: Captain Brasfield, A.W. Silva, Case Manager, United States of America, HSA Franks, D. Datray, J. Doer, A.W. Queen, Unit Manager and Beardsly
Case Number: 1:2024cv01557
Filed: December 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Kirk E Sherriff
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING #10 Plaintiff's Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections as Moot signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/27/2025. (Deputy Clerk AML)
January 27, 2025 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order on Motion for Extension of Time served on Skyler McMillion. (Deputy Clerk AML)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Skyler McMillion. (Deputy Clerk AML)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time and DENYING #9 Motion for Copy of Certified Trust Fund Account as Moot signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/24/2025. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Deputy Clerk AML)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME by Skyler McMillion. (Deputy Clerk AML)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order on Motion served on Skyler McMillion. (Deputy Clerk AML)
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Unit Team to Deliver Certified Trust Fund Account of Past 6 Months by Skyler McMillion. (Deputy Clerk AML)
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME by Skyler McMillion. (Deputy Clerk AML)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign a District Judge to This Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Dismissal of Action for Failure to Exhaust the Administrative Remedies re #1 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/21/2025. Referred to Judge Sherriff. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Deputy Clerk AML)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY): This case has been assigned to District Judge Kirk E. Sherriff and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is: 1:24-cv-01557-KES-SAB (PC). (Deputy Clerk AML)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, #7 Findings and Recommendations served on Skyler McMillion. (Deputy Clerk AML)
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Action Should not be Dismissed without Prejudice, for Failure to Exhaust the Administrative Remedies, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/20/2024. Show Cause Response due within Twenty-One Days. (Maldonado, C)
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order to Show Cause served on Skyler McMillion. (Maldonado, C)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Maldonado, C)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 1/21/2025. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Skyler McMillion. (Maldonado, C)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1331) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Beardsly, Captain Brasfield, Case Manager, D. Datray, J. Doer, Franks, Queen, Silva, Unit Manager, United States of America by Skyler McMillion. (Maldonado, C)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Skyler McMillion. (Maldonado, C)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Skyler McMillion. (Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) McMillion v. Doer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Brasfield
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Silva
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case Manager
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSA Franks
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Datray
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Doer
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Queen
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit Manager
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beardsly
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skyler McMillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?