Enriquez v. City of Bakersfield, et al.
Plaintiff: Roberto Enriquez, Jr.
Defendant: City of Bakersfield, Marc TaFoya, Colin Newhouse and Andrew Nabors
Case Number: 1:2024cv01588
Filed: December 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Christopher D Baker
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2025 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by City of Bakersfield. Attorney Marderosian, Michael G. added.(Marderosian, Michael)
January 7, 2025 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Defendants. (Lagos, Panos)
December 27, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/26/2025 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield (CDB) before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. (Attachments: #1 CDB Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
December 27, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *City of Bakersfield, Andrew Nabors, Colin Newhouse, Marc TaFoya* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Panos Lagos* *Law Offices of Panos Lagos* *6569 Glen Oaks Way* *Oakland, CA 94611*. (Lundstrom, T)
December 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages, Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants by Roberto Enriquez, Jr. Attorney Lagos, Panos added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11944718) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lagos, Panos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enriquez v. City of Bakersfield, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bakersfield
Represented By: Virginia Anne Gennaro
Represented By: Michael Marderosian
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc TaFoya
Represented By: Virginia Anne Gennaro
Represented By: Michael Marderosian
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin Newhouse
Represented By: Virginia Anne Gennaro
Represented By: Michael Marderosian
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Nabors
Represented By: Virginia Anne Gennaro
Represented By: Michael Marderosian
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Enriquez, Jr.
Represented By: Panos Lagos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?