McCracken v. County of Inyo, et al.
Plaintiff: Khaliq McCracken
Defendant: County of Inyo, California Highway Patrol, Deputy John Bartlett (#651), Corporal Joseph Kapturkiewicz (#658) and Officer Adam Carrasco
Case Number: 1:2025cv00165
Filed: February 7, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Christopher D Baker
Referring Judge: Kirk E Sherriff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2025 Filing 20 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION by California Highway Patrol, Officer Adam Carrasco. Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Kirk E. Sherriff. (Reyes, Ashley)
March 31, 2025 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Kirk E. Sherriff and Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. The new case number is: 1:25-cv-00165-KES-CDB. (Deputy Clerk SSA)
March 28, 2025 Filing 18 REPLY by California Highway Patrol, Officer Adam Carrasco to RESPONSE to #13 Motion to Dismiss,,. (Reyes, Ashley)
March 28, 2025 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Reyes, Ashley)
March 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 03/27/2025: In light of Defendants' pending motion to dismiss and Plaintiff's opposition (Docs. #13 , #15 ), the parties are directed to review the case opening documents and promptly file completed "Consent / Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction" forms. See (Docs. 6-1, 6-3) ("The parties are strongly encouraged to submit their consent forms before the filing of any motion, so the motion can be noticed before the proper judge.") (Deputy Clerk CRB)
March 26, 2025 Filing 15 OPPOSITION by Khaliq McCracken to #13 Motion to Dismiss,,. (McRae, Lauren)
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER on Stipulation extending time to respond to complaint #12 signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 3/7/2025. Filing Deadline: 4/11/2025. (Deputy Clerk TEL)
March 6, 2025 Filing 13 MOTION to DISMISS by California Highway Patrol, Officer Adam Carrasco. Attorney Reyes, Ashley N. added. Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2025 at 10:30 AM in Bakersfield (CDB) before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities STATE DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL ASHLEY REYES IN SUPPORT OF STATE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, #3 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER ON STATE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT)(Reyes, Ashley)
March 6, 2025 Filing 12 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Deputy John Bartlett (#651), County of Inyo. Attorney Gross, Matthew W. added. (Gross, Matthew)
February 27, 2025 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Officer Adam Carrasco served on 2/24/2025, answer due 3/17/2025. (Carr, Peter)
February 27, 2025 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: California Highway Patrol served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025. (Carr, Peter)
February 27, 2025 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: County of Inyo served on 2/19/2025, answer due 3/12/2025. (Carr, Peter)
February 24, 2025 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Corporal Joseph Kapturkiewicz (#658) served on 2/18/2025, answer due 3/11/2025. (Carr, Peter)
February 24, 2025 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Deputy John Bartlett (#651) served on 2/19/2025, answer due 3/12/2025. (Carr, Peter)
February 10, 2025 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/7/2025 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield (CDB) before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A(m), #2 CDB Worksheet, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Deputy Clerk OFR)
February 10, 2025 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Officer Adam Carrasco, Corporal Joseph Kapturkiewicz (#658)* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lauren Khali McRae* *Plc Law Group, Apc* *3756 Santa Rosalia Dr., Ste 326* *Los Angeles, CA 90008*. (Deputy Clerk OFR)
February 10, 2025 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Deputy John Bartlett (#651), California Highway Patrol, County of Inyo* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lauren Khali McRae* *Plc Law Group, Apc* *3756 Santa Rosalia Dr., Ste 326* *Los Angeles, CA 90008*. (Deputy Clerk OFR)
February 8, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Na'Shaun L. Neal on behalf of Khaliq McCracken. Attorney Neal, Na'Shaun L. added. (Neal, Na'Shaun)
February 7, 2025 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Khaliq McCracken. (McRae, Lauren)
February 7, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Khaliq McCracken. Attorney McRae, Lauren Khali added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-12029086) (McRae, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCracken v. County of Inyo, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khaliq McCracken
Represented By: Lauren Khali McRae
Represented By: Peter Laurence Carr, IV
Represented By: Na'Shaun L. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Inyo
Represented By: Matthew W. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Highway Patrol
Represented By: Ashley N. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy John Bartlett (#651)
Represented By: Matthew W. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Joseph Kapturkiewicz (#658)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Adam Carrasco
Represented By: Ashley N. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?