(PC) Bonilla v. Toscano et al
Plaintiff: Rene Bonilla
Defendant: M. Toscano and CDCR
Case Number: 1:2025cv00211
Filed: February 18, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
Referring Judge: Kirk E Sherriff
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Clerk to assign case to District Judge and close case based upon Plaintiff's Voluntary Dismissal under FRCP 41 (a)(1)(A)(i) #8 signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 3/10/2025. CASE CLOSED. (Deputy Clerk TEL)
March 10, 2025 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Kirk E. Sherriff and Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. The new case number is: 1:25-cv-00211-KES-HBK-(PC). (Deputy Clerk TEL)
March 10, 2025 SERVICE BY MAIL: 9 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, #10 Order Dismissing Case served on Rene Bonilla. (Deputy Clerk TEL)
March 7, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Rene Bonilla. (Deputy Clerk OFR)
February 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Deferring Ruling on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Case Should not be Dismissed for Failure to Exhaust, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 02/20/2025. Show Cause Response due by 3/20/2025. (Deputy Clerk CM)
February 21, 2025 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order to Show Cause served on Rene Bonilla. (Deputy Clerk CM)
February 19, 2025 Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Rene Bonilla. (Deputy Clerk EF)
February 19, 2025 Filing 5 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on CCI. (Deputy Clerk EF)
February 19, 2025 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Rene Bonilla, CDCR No. J-72704 to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in.pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Deputy Clerk EF)
February 19, 2025 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *2/18/2025*. Consent or Decline due by 3/24/2025. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Deputy Clerk EF)
February 18, 2025 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Rene Bonilla. (Deputy Clerk EF)
February 18, 2025 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against CDCR, M. Toscano by Rene Bonilla. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Deputy Clerk EF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Bonilla v. Toscano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Toscano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?