(SS) Hayes v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Hannah Nicole Hayes
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2025cv00215
Filed: February 19, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2025 Filing 12 NOTICE OF LODGING SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Hall, Benjamin E. added. (Attachments: #1 Complete Certified Administrative Record (Pages 1-1105), #2 Complete Certified Administrative Record (Pages 1106-1755))(Hall, Benjamin)
February 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/28/2025, Nunc Pro Tunc 02/27/2025: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 1:25-cv-00215-SKO (SS).. (Deputy Clerk WAK)
February 27, 2025 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Martin, Justin)
February 21, 2025 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Benavides, Francesco)
February 21, 2025 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Francesco Paulo Benavides re ECF #7 : Your document is incomplete. Please re-file a completed form. (Deputy Clerk JPX)
February 20, 2025 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Benavides, Francesco)
February 20, 2025 Filing 6 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Social Security Complaint, #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #5 Social Security New Case Documents for MJ as Presider, #4 Summons served on Commissioner of Social Security Pursuant to e-service agreement. (Deputy Clerk TEL)
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 5/27/2025. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Deputy Clerk TEL)
February 20, 2025 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Francesco Paulo Benavides* *Law Offices of Francesco* *1990 N. California Blvd., 8th Floor* *Walnut Creek, CA 94596*. (Deputy Clerk TEL)
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/20/2025. (Deputy Clerk TEL)
February 19, 2025 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Hannah Nicole Hayes. (Benavides, Francesco)
February 19, 2025 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Hannah Nicole Hayes. Attorney Benavides, Francesco Paulo added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benavides, Francesco)
February 19, 2025 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Deputy Clerk JPX)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Hayes v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Nicole Hayes
Represented By: Francesco Paulo Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: Justin Lane Martin, GOVT
Represented By: Benjamin E. Hall, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?