S.G. v. Tehachapi Unified School District et al
Plaintiff: S.G.
Defendant: Tehachapi Unified School District, Francis M. Lynch, Kendra Bailey and Elizabeth Spoden
Case Number: 1:2025cv00233
Filed: February 21, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Christopher D Baker
Referring Judge: Kirk E Sherriff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2025 Filing 15 STIPULATION To Extend Time To Respond by Kendra Bailey, Francis M. Lynch, Elizabeth Spoden, Tehachapi Unified School District. Attorney Herr, Leonard Charles added. (Herr, Leonard)
March 31, 2025 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Kendra Bailey served on 3/29/2025, answer due 4/21/2025. (Rivera, Anna)
March 26, 2025 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Elizabeth Spoden served on 3/24/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (Rivera, Anna)
March 24, 2025 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Francis M. Lynch served on 3/19/2025, answer due 4/9/2025. (Rivera, Anna)
March 24, 2025 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Tehachapi Unified School District served on 3/19/2025, answer due 4/9/2025. (Rivera, Anna)
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Renewed Ex Parte Application for Application for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem of Minor S.G., signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 03/11/2025. (Deputy Clerk CM)
March 10, 2025 Filing 9 EX PARTE APPLICATION by S.G. for Appointment of Guardian ad litem. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sheila Rosario Flores Gutierrez in support of Ex Parte Petition, #2 Declaration of Anna Rivera in support of Ex Parte Petition, #3 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Petition)(Rivera, Anna)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING #2 Ex Parte Application for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem of Minor S.G. signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 02/25/2025. 14-Day Deadline. (Deputy Clerk CRB)
February 24, 2025 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by S.G.. (Barajas, Maronel)
February 21, 2025 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2025 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield (CDB) before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. (Attachments: #1 CDB Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Deputy Clerk SSA)
February 21, 2025 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Elizabeth Spoden, Tehachapi Unified School District* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Maronel Barajas* *1440 N. Harbor Blvd.* *Suite 900* *Fullerton, CA 92835*. (Deputy Clerk SSA)
February 21, 2025 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Kendra Bailey, Francis M. Lynch* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Maronel Barajas* *1440 N. Harbor Blvd.* *Suite 900* *Fullerton, CA 92835*. (Deputy Clerk SSA)
February 21, 2025 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Maronel Barajas re #1 Complaint: Under Local Rule 200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444. (Deputy Clerk EF)
February 21, 2025 Filing 2 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Tehachapi Unified School District for Appointment of Guardian ad litem. (Barajas, Maronel)
February 21, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Tehachapi Unified School District. Attorney Barajas, Maronel added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-12054246) (Barajas, Maronel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.G. v. Tehachapi Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.G.
Represented By: Maronel Barajas
Represented By: Anna Mercedes Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tehachapi Unified School District
Represented By: Leonard Charles Herr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis M. Lynch
Represented By: Leonard Charles Herr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendra Bailey
Represented By: Leonard Charles Herr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Spoden
Represented By: Leonard Charles Herr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?