USA, et al v. Aerojet General Corp, et al
Plaintiff: USA and CA State
Defendant: Aerojet General Corp and Cordova Chemical Company
Intervenor: Sacramento County, Sacramento County Water Agency and California-American Water Company
Case Number: 2:1986cv00063
Filed: January 15, 1986
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 6901
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 STIPULATION and ORDER TERMINATING PARTIAL CONSENT DECREE PROVISION FOR LAND RESTRICTIONS FOR PARCEL NO. 072-0231-128 (PORTION) AND 072-0231-129 (PORTION) signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 10/24/2017. (Washington, S)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 183 AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 5/28/15 re: Partial Consent Decree provision relating to Exhibit I-4 Land. (Becknal, R)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 182 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 5/22/2015 re: Partial Consent Decree provision relating to Exhibit I-4 Land.(Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA, et al v. Aerojet General Corp, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Robert D. Mullaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CA State
Represented By: Denise Ferkich Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerojet General Corp
Represented By: Thomas M Donnelly
Represented By: Lawrence A. Hobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cordova Chemical Company
Represented By: Thomas M Donnelly
Represented By: Lawrence A. Hobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Sacramento County
Represented By: William Hvidsten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Sacramento County Water Agency
Represented By: William Hvidsten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: California-American Water Company
Represented By: Nancy J. Casale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?