USA, et al v. Iron Mountain Mines, et al
Plaintiff: |
USA and State of California |
Defendant: |
Bayer CropScience, Inc fka Aventis CropScience USA Inc |
Cross_claimant: |
Rhone-Poulnec Basic Chemicals Company and Rhone-Poulenc Inc |
Cross_defendant: |
Iron Mountain Mines, T. W. Arman and USA |
Claimant: |
Bayer CropScience, Inc fka Aventis CropScience USA Inc |
Case Number: |
2:1991cv00768 |
Filed: |
December 22, 2009 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Mendez |
Presiding Judge: |
John F. Moulds |
Nature of Suit: |
Environmental Matters |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 9607 Real Property Tort to Land |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 16, 2010 |
Filing
1326
FINAL JUDGMENT 1325 signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/15/2010. (Marciel, M)
|
October 1, 2010 |
Filing
1323
ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/1/10 GRANTING Plaintiff US' MOTION TO AMEND the 7/13/10 order for partial Summary Judgment for US' response costs 1319 . (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
July 13, 2010 |
Filing
1318
ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/13/10 ORDERING pltf's MOTION for PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 1280 is GRANTED. (Carlos, K)
|
May 6, 2010 |
Filing
1316
ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 05/05/10 DENYING dfts' 1299 Motion for Reconsideration. (Benson, A.)
|
December 22, 2009 |
Filing
1306
ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/21/09 ORDERING that hearing re 1300 Motion for Reconsideration is continued to 3/3/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. Oppositions to 1300 Motion due by 1/29/10; Reply brie fs due by 2/19/10. It is further ORDERED that defts response to 1280 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment due by 1/29/10; pltfs reply brief due by 2/19/10; hearing re 1280 is continued to 3/3/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. No hearing re 1293 Motion for Schedule for Remaining Briefing is necessary and parties need not appear on 1/6/10. (Owen, K)
|
August 13, 2009 |
Filing
1278
ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/12/09 ORDERING that Non-party, John F. Hutchens, Requested permission to file documents in this action is denied pursuant to the court's order of 1/02/09. The Court further advises John F. Hutchens that further requests to file documents, without benefit of counsel, may subject John F. Hutchens to monetary sanctions."(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
January 5, 2009 |
Filing
1275
ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 01/02/09 ORDERING that: 1261 John F. Hutchens' Motion to Join or Intervene (Notice of Joinder) is DENIED w/o prejudice to filing of a proper motion by an attorney representing him; that John F. Hutchens shall file no more documents in this proceeding, unless he files them through an attorney admitted to practice in this Court; that all documents filed by John F. Hutchens in this proceeding through 12/17/08 ( 1262 , 1266 , 1270 , 1271 and 1272 ) are STRICKEN on the grounds that he was not party and was not authorized to practice law on behalf of the dfts who are parties, and plfs need make no further response to any of those filings; that all documents ( 1269 ) filed by dft Arman, either on his behalf or on behalf of Iron Mountain Mines, and either pro per or with or through John F. Hutchens, are STRICKEN on the grounds that they were not signed by counsel of record for the dfts, and plfs need make no further response to any of those f ilings; that if either dft T.W. Arman or Iron Mountain Mines, Inc., is to change counsel, that William Logan shall file a motion to withdraw as counsel, and that the respective dft shall seek new counsel with Mr. Logan's assistance; that as soon as possible the plfs shall file their respective motions for partial summary judgment to recover past costs, through the date previously set by this Court. Counsel for the plfs advised the Court that they expect to be able to file their motions by l ate Spring or early Summer of 2009. In his last filing, 12/17/08, John F. Hutchens stated that he had signed dft Arman's name to some documents which Mr. Hutchens filed, allegedly with Mr. Arman's authorization. In light of Mr. Hutchens' admission, the Court declined to inquire further into the identity of the person or persons who signed documents bearing the signatures of defendant Arman. The plfs had no objection. (Benson, A.) Modified on 1/5/2009 (Benson, A.).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?