Lasheen v. Loomis Company, et al
Case Number: 2:2001cv00227
Filed: February 2, 2001
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/28/18 DENYING 444 Motion for Reconsideration; Plaintiff's Motion for leave to deposit funds and for a turnover order to disburse funds to counsel 449 is GRANTED in part and DENYED in part as follows: Plaintiff's Motion for leave to deposit the $1,500 sanction into the court's deposit fund is GRANTED. The deposit shall be completed within 7 days of this order. Plaintiff's Motion for an order to distribute funds is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/4/2017 DENYING 435 Motion for Sanctions. (Zignago, K.)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/03/17 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 421 Motion to Compel as follows: Egypt shall provide further responses to plaintiff's Interrogatory No. 1 andRequests for Production No. 1. The response shall be limited to the property related to the ERISA plan. b. The Embassy and Bureau shall provide further responses to plaintiff's Interrogatories Nos. 1-6 and Requests for Production of Documents Nos. 1-6. The Egyptian defendant s shall produce a person most knowledgeable for a judgment debtor examination to provide testimony as to the Egyptians defendants' assets that may be subject to execution, as provided herein. The parties shall meet and confer regarding an appropriate date and time for such examination. d. The motion is denied in all other respects. 2. Plaintiff shall reimburse the Egyptian defendants in the amount of $1,500 for the reasonable expenses it incurred on 03/08/17. (Benson, A.)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/17/17 ORDERING that Defendants' 425 request for an extension of time to respond to plaintiff's motion to compel is GRANTED. The hearing on plaintiff's 421 motion to compel is CONTINUED to 8/30/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Defendants shall file an opposition to the motion, or a statement of non-opposition thereto, no later than 8/1/2017. Failure to file an opposition to the motion will be deemed a statement of non-opposition thereto, and may result in plaintiff's motion being granted. Plaintiff may file a reply to defendants' opposition, if any, on or before 8/9/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/22/16. (Judgment Debtor Exam as to Cultural and Educational Bureau SET for 3/8/2017 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/2/16 ORDERING the Cultural and Educational Bureau to Appear for Examination on 11/30/16 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Becknal, R)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 393 AMENDED DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Arab Republic of Egypt, Cultural and Education Bureau, Embassy of the Arab Republic of Egypt in the total amount of $549,826.06. (Reader, L)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 385 STATUS ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 03/25/2016 ORDERING that any motions for updated attorneys' fees or regarding execution of the judgment shall be noticed for hearing no later than 6/3/16. This order may be modified only with leave of the court and for good cause. (Jackson, T)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 369 DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Arab Republic of Egypt, Cultural and Education Bureau, Embassy of the Arab Republic of Egypt signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/24/2013. (Michel, G)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 363 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/21/13 RECOMMENDING that 345 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Mohamed E Lasheen be granted in part, as provided herein; and Lasheen be awarded the following amount against the Egyptian defendants, jointly and severally: $200,000, based on defendants' violation of 29 USC Section 1132(a)(1)(B); $54,926 in pre-judgment interest; and $226,251.63 in attorney's fees, for a total of $481,177.63. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections to F&R due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Meuleman, A)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/24/12 ORDERING that The Egyptian defendants' request for a continuance and an extension of time, 353 is granted; The October 3, 2012 hearing on plaintiff's motion for default jud gment, 345 is continued to December 5, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 24; The Egyptian defendants shall file an opposition to the motion, or a statement of non-opposition thereto, no later than November 14, 2012; Failure of the Egyptian defen dants to file an opposition will be deemed a statement of non-opposition to the motion, and may result in a recommendation that the motion be granted; Plaintiff may file a reply to the Egyptian defendants' opposition, if any, on or before November 21, 2012. (Becknal, R)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/15/11 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 3/7/11 326 are ADOPTED in full; Loomis' Applciation for entry of default judgment against the Egyptian defendants is GRANTED. Loom is is awarded $270,419.65 in attorneys fees and costs, plus $55,195.06 in pre-judgment interest, for a total of $325,614.71, to be to be paid by the Egyptian defendants. The Egyptian defendants may file a motion or stipulation for a stay of the fee award within fourteen (14) days of the issuance of this order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 326 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/7/11 recommending that Loomis's application for entry of default judgment against the Egyptian defendants be granted; and Loomis be awarded $270,419,65 in attorneys fees and costs, plus $55,195.06 in prejudgment interest, for a total of $325,614.71. Objections to F&R due w/in 14 days. (Matson, R)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/31/10 ORDERING that the Egyptian defendants' motion to dismiss or for summary judgment 307 is DENIED, and plaintiff and Loomis' joint motion for a determination on FSIA immunity 239 is again GRANTED. (Becknal, R)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/8/2010 ORDERING that defendants SHALL file a motion for summary judgment on this issue on or before August 2, 2010. Plaintiff SHALL file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to defendants' motion on or before August 16, 2010. Defendant MAY file a reply brief on or before August 23, 2010. Hearing on this matter is SET for August 30, 2010, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom Four.(Duong, D)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/9/2010 re 302 Mandate ORDERING that plaintiff is to file a notice of whether it wishes to continue litigation not later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order.(Duong, D)
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/1/08 ORDERING that 239 the Joint Motion regarding the inapplicability of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act to the Egyptian dfts is GRANTED. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lasheen v. Loomis Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?