Leonard v. Bonner, et al
Plaintiff: Harvey Mack Leonard
Defendant: M - Thompson
Case Number: 2:2002cv02023
Filed: July 2, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/7/09 DENYING 121 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/2/09: Defendants' motion for leave to file a motion for summary judgment or to amend the answer is DENIED 116 120 . (Kaminski, H)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER AND WRIT ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 04/14/09 ordering issuance of a writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum; Custodian to produce Harvey M. Leonard at 06/02/09 at 10:30 a.m. in courtroom 4 before Judge Karlton; Custod ian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is order to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall also serve a copy of this order on the Out-to-Court desk, California State Prison. (cc: USM priority)(Plummer, M) Modified on 4/16/2009 (Plummer, M).
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 04/07/09 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel is DENIED; Plaintiff's motion in limine to exclude evidence of his status as a sexually violent predator, including evidence of where plaintiff is house and why he is housed there, is GRANTED; however, plaintiff's status as a civil detaineee is admissiable; in accordance with this ruling, defendants' Exhibit C is STRICKEN; Defendants' request to in troduce evidence of plaintiff's felony convictions for purposes of impeachment is GRANTED; with the limitation that defendants may only introduce evidence of plaintiff's felony convictions, if any, obtained within the last 10 years; the Court will defer ruling on the admissibility of all other exhibits until trial, if and when such exhibits are offered. Jury trial is set for June 2, 2009 at 10:30 am in Courtroom No. 4. (Streeter, J)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER AND WRIT ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 01/28/09 ORDERING issuance of writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum; Custodian to produce Harvey M. Leonard via video-conference at 11:15 am on 03/09/09 before the Honorable Lawrence K. Karlton; Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (Manzer, C)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 01/27/09 ORDERING that the recommendations for dismissal of defedant Sandhu contained in the Final Pretrial Order of 5/12/06 is ADOPTED; Defendant Sandhu is DISMISSED from this action; the Trial Confirmation Hearing is now set for for 3/9/2009 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; and Jury Trial reset for 6/2/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Streeter, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard v. Bonner, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Mack Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M - Thompson
Represented By: Brett Daniel Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?