Avina v. Fischer, et al

Case Number: 2:2002cv02661
Filed: December 12, 2002
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 5/11/11 ORDERING the judgment entered 151 entered on 10/1/10 again Aguirre, Fischer and Rosario is VACATED. (Carlos, K)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/3/2010 RECOMMENDING that dfts' 123 motion for pre-trial relief, construed as a motion for reconsideration, be denied; pltf's 125 motion for summary judgmen t be granted as to dfts Fischer, Rosario and Aguirre; the court vacate it's previous 105 , 107 finding that "some evidence" supported pltf's validation as a gang affiliate; the court order dft Fischer or his successor to expung e pltf's validation as a gang associate and all related docs from pltf's central file w/in 30 days or provide pltf w/ documented proof that expungment has occured no later than 30 days after compliance; all other requests for injunctive rel ief be denied; the court award pltf nominal damages of $1.00; the court decline to award compensatory and punitive damages; the court enter final judgment against dfts Fischer, Rosario and Aguirre; this case be closed. Referred to Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr.; Objections due w/in 21 days.(Yin, K)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 06/04/10 ordering plaintiff's motion to supplement the record 134 , constured by the court as a renewed motion for appointment of counsel is denied. Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time in which to identify and disclose expert witnesses 135 is denied. (Plummer, M)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 04/15/10 DENYING 131 Motion for Reconsideration. (Williams, D)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 02/22/10 denying 124 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff's request to re-open discovery [125-4] is denied. (Plummer, M)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/12/09 ORDERING that 120 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED; Trial set for 8/17/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr.. The parties have 30 days from the entry of this order in which to request any pre-trial relief they deem is warranted under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this court.(Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avina v. Fischer, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?