Burgess v. Runnels
Petitioner: Christopher Daniel Burgess
Respondent: D. L. Runnels
Case Number: 2:2003cv01196
Filed: June 4, 2003
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/18/14 ordering the time to file objections to the findings and recommendations is extended 14 days until 12/03/14. (Plummer, M)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/04/14 recommending that petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus be denied; and the district court issue a certificate of appealability limited as set forth above. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/29/13 ORDERING that 52 Motion is granted in part; Respondent shall file a response to the amended habeas petition within forty-five days of this order. No extensions of time will be given absent compelling reasons, due to non-compliance with the courts previous order. The remainder of August 15, 2013 order remains unchanged.(Dillon, M)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/13/13 ORDERING that petitioner shall file an amended petition on or before April 8, 2013. No further extensions will be permitted, absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. (Dillon, M)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/15/12 ORDERING that petitioner is granted 60 days to attempt to locate the trial transcript and file an amended petition. (Dillon, M)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/9/2012 ORDERING that the status report describing how this case will proceed shall be filed on or before 8/23/2012. (Zignago, K.)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/25/12 GRANTING 24 Motion to Seal and exhibit shall be filed under seal and neither respondent nor any other party shall be allowed access unless express permission is provided by the court. The Federal Defender is ordered to appoint new counsel to represent petitioner and provide a status report within 45 days describing how this case will proceed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve this order on David Porter, Assistant Federal Defender. (cc David Porter)(Dillon, M)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/19/2012 ORDERING petitioner's counsel to SHOW CAUSE within 7 days why the stay in this matter should not be lifted, and the petition dismissed. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgess v. Runnels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Daniel Burgess
Represented By: Joseph J. Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D. L. Runnels
Represented By: Angelo Sipin Edralin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?