Andrews v. Cervantes, et al
Case Number: 2:2003cv01218
Filed: June 6, 2003
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Peter A. Nowinski
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 04/12/11 DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/1/2011 ORDERING that, within 14 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition or statement of no opposition to 86 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tilton, Trevino, Santos Cervantes. Failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Waggoner, D)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER denying 80 Motion for issuance of a discovery order signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/15/09. (Plummer, M)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying 78 Motion for leave to file electronically signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 09/08/09. (Plummer, M)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 02/05/09 ordering that defendants' 01/02/09 request for an extension of time to respond to discovery requests 69 is granted. Defendants shall have 30 days from the date this court resolves the motion to dismiss to serve responses to plaintiff's discovery requests. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. Cervantes, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?