Technology Licensing v. Technicolor USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2003cv01329
Filed: June 20, 2003
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 7/27/2011 ORDERING that Technology Licensing Corporations 335 motion to dismiss Technicolors counterclaims be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. All pending dates before this court are hereby VACATED. CASE CLOSED.(Duong, D)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 355 UNOPPOSED ORDER to continue hearing signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 7/14/2011. Technicolor USA's 324 Motion to Adopt Part 1 of Special Master's Report and Recommendations is RE-SCHEDULED for 9/12/2011 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS). (Marciel, M)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 6/21/2011 ORDERING 346 Exhibits A-1 and A-2 to the Declaration of Gary R. Maze be filed under SEAL; the Clerk shall redact listed lines from dft Technicolor USA's Opposition to pltfs Motion to Dismiss, and with the exception of the foregoing, the motion to file under seal is DENIED; and dft's Opposition to the Motion to dismissed shall be DEEMED timely filed. (Reader, L)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 6/17/2011 re 344 Defendant's Notice of Request to Seal Document(s): Within seven days from the date of this Order, defendant Technicolor USA, Inc., shall submit a brief specifically identifying, by pag e and line, the language in the documents which defendant contends to constitute trade secrets, along with an explanation as to why such language constitutes a trade secret. Such brief may be filed under seal. The court will withhold ruling on the pending request to seal until after review of that brief. (See document for further details).(Kirksey Smith, K)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 5/26/2011 re 341 Special Master's Request for Clarification: To the extent that the parties agree that the Special Master should continue his work on claim construction pending resolution of the two mo tions now pending before the court 324 , 335 , the Special Master may continue. However, to the extent that the parties disagree, the Special Master is instructed to suspend his work on this action until further notice from the court. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Kirksey Smith, K)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 5/20/2011 ORDERING that Technicolor Licensing Corporation's 336 Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time is DENIED. The hearing on Technicolor USA, Inc.'s Motion to Adopt Part 1 of the Special Master 's Report and Recommendations is continued to August 1, 2011, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom No. 5. The court's 332 May 4, 2011, Order amending the scheduling order is amended as follows: The parties shall disclose experts and produce reports by no later than September 29, 2011. With regard to expert testimony intended solely for rebuttal, those experts shall be disclosed and reports produced on or before October 31, 2011. All discovery shall be completed by December 5, 2011. All pretrial motions shall be filed by January 3, 2012. The Final Pretrial Conference is RESET for March 19, 2012, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom No. 5. The trial is RESET for May 22, 2012, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 5. (Duong, D)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 5/20/11 ORDERING that Technicolor Licensing Corporation's EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten time 336 is DENIED. The hearing on Technicolor USA, Inc's MOTION to Adopt Part 1 of the Special Master 9;s Report and Recommendations 324 is CONTINUED to 8/1/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5. The Court's 5/4/11 Order AMENDING the Scheduling Order 332 is AMENDED AS FOLLOWS: The parties shall disclose Experts and produce reports by no later than 9/29/2011. With regard to Expert Testimony, those experts shall be disclosed and reports produced on or before 10/31/2011. All Discovery shall be completed by due by 12/5/2011. All Pretrial Motions shall be filed by 1/3/2012. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 3/19/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. The Trial is RESET for 5/22/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 5/4/2011 ORDERING that dft's 329 ex parte motion to REOPEN CASE is GRANTED; dft's Motion to Adopt Part 1 of the Special Master's R & R's Hearing is reset for 7/5/2011 at 02:00 PM in Cour troom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb; the court's 323 Order amending the scheduling order is further amended: Disclosure of Expert Witnesses due by 9/1/2011; Expert testimony for rebuttal by 10/3/2011; Discovery due by 11/7/2011; all pretrial motions filed by 12/6/2011; Final Pretrial Conference reset for 2/21/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb; Trial reset for 4/17/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb.(Reader, L)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 327 JUDGMENT pursuant to 326 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment. (Benson, A.)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 2/11/2011 GRANTING 321 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 6/1/2011. Discovery due by 8/5/2011. Pretrial Motions filed by 9/6/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2011 at 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 1/18/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Zignago, K.)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 10/25/2010 denying 302 Motion to Prohibit plaintiff from introducing certain evidence. Plaintiffs have 30 days from the date of this order to file an Amended Complaint consistent withthe court's 10/18/ 2010 312 Order. The Court's 11/13/2009, scheduling order is hereby AMENDED as follows: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 2/1/2011, Discovery due by 4/6/2011, Dispositive Motions filed by 5/6/2011. The Final Pretrial Conference is RESET for 7/11/2011 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. The Jury Trial is RESET for 9/20/2011 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Waggoner, D)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 10/15/10 ORDERING dft's motion for judgment on the pleadings on pltf's claims of inducing and contributory infringement 295 be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED and those claims are hereby DISMISSED; following the 10/25/10 hearing on the parties' pending motions, the court will set a date by which pltf may file the amended complaint consistent with this order. (Carlos, K)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 299 STIPULATION and ORDER 298 for continuance signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/2/2010. Defendant Technicolor USA's 295 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Hearing is RE-SCHEDULED for 10/12/2010 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS). Plaintiff's Opposition will be due on 9/28/2010 and defendant's Reply will be due on 10/5/2010. (Marciel, M)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 08/27/10 DENYING 270 and 274 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment. (Manzer, C)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER granting 288 Motion signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 8/19/10. (Kaminski, H)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 273 JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 4/13/10 ORDERING that Gale R. ("Pete") Peterson will be appointed as special master for purposes of claim construction, pursuant to the parties' stipulation, and to perform the duties as set forth in the parties' stipulation. (Becknal, R)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 3/9/10 ORDERING that w/i 30 days, the parties shall submit a statement indicating whom they have jointly upon agreed to serve as special master, and that person shall file w/i the same period a n affidavit with the court; After receiving the parties' joint statement, the court will schedule a status conference to discuss, and agree upon, the final form the Order appointing the Special Master shall take,which shall include a statement o f the scope of the Special Master's duties. The Special Master shall proceed with all reasonable diligence in conducting a Markman hrg and preparing for the court a report recommending constructions for the patent terms at issue. The parties w ill be afforded an opportunity to file any objections to the Special Master's report, and if the court finds it helpful, oral argument on the objections may be scheduled. The court will thereafter issue a final claim construction order. (Becknal, R)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 2/8/10 DENYING 230 Motion to Intervene and for Stay. (Owen, K)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 238 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 1/19/2010 GRANTING 234 Stipulation and Proposed Order; Technology Licensing Corporation may file its Second Amended Complaint. (Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Technology Licensing v. Technicolor USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?