Grayson, et al v. Carey
Case Number: 2:2003cv01694
Filed: August 12, 2003
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Bommer on 8/16/2011 recommending that the petition for writ of habeas corpus be denied; referred to Judge Morrison C. England. Objections due within twenty-one days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Duong, D)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Due to the appointment of Recalled Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Bommer to the bench of the Eastern District, this action is REASSIGNED from Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Bommer for all further proceedings. The District Judge currently assigned to the case will remain unchanged. (Donati, J)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 07/06/10 ordering that petitioner's reply points and authorities will be due 08/18/10. (Plummer, M)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION and ORDER 65 extending Briefing Schedule signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/29/2010. Petitioner's Reply Points and Authorities will now be due 6/19/2010. (Marciel, M)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 01/15/10 ordering pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, it is hereby ordered that petitioner's points and authorities will be due 02/04/10. Respondent's points and authorities will be due 03/04/10, and petitioner's reply will be due on 04/04/10. No further extensions will be granted. (Plummer, M)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/16/09 and stipulated between the parties MODIFYING the briefing schedule. Petitioner's Ps & As due 1/4/2010, Respondent's Ps & As due 2/4/2010, and petitioner's reply due 3/4/2010. (Yin, K)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/30/09 ordering that petitioner's points and authorities will be due 12/04/09, respondent's points and authorities will be due 01/04/10 and petitioner's reply will be due 02/04/10. (Plummer, M)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/13/09 and agreed between the parties to MODIFY the briefing schedule: petitioner's Ps and As due 8/31/09; respondent's Ps and As due 9/30/09; and petitioner's Reply due 10/30/09. (Yin, K)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 01/16/09 ORDERING that petitioner's points and authorities will be due April 24, 2009, respondent's points and authorities will be due June 24, 2009, and petitioner's reply will be due on July 26, 2009. (Manzer, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grayson, et al v. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?