Lewis, et al v. Russell, et al
Plaintiff: Charles H Lewis and Jane W Lewis
Defendant: Ben J Newitt, The Estate of Phillip Newitt, Jung Hang Suh, Soo Jung Suh, Jung K Seo, The Davis Center LLC, Workroom Supply Inc, Safety-Kleen Corporation, City of Davis, Melvin R Stover, Emily A Stover, Stover Family Trust, Richard Albert Stinchfield, Robert S. Stinchfield Separate Property Revocable Trust, The Barbara Ellen Stinchfield Testamentary Trust, Irene Russell, Martinizing Frnachieses Inc., aka/dba Martinizing Dry Cleaning, Martin Franchising, Inc. and VIC Manufacturing Company
Counter_claimant: Jung Hang Suh, Soo Jung Suh, City of Davis, The Davis Center LLC, Melvin R Stover, Emily A Stover, Stover Family Trust, Richard Albert Stinchfield, Robert S. Stinchfield Separate Property Revocable Trust, The Barbara Ellen Stinchfield Testamentary Trust, Ben J Newitt, Marie Whitcombe, Potter Taylor & Company, Potter Long Adams & Taylor LTD, Davis Center, Potter-Taylor Inc and Potter Taylor & Scurfield Inc
Counter_defendant: Charles H Lewis, Jane W Lewis, Jung Hang Suh, Soo Jung Suh, Potter Taylor & Company, Potter Long Adams & Taylor LTD, Davis Center, Potter-Taylor Inc, Potter Taylor & Scurfield Inc and The Davis Center LLC
Cross_claimant: Jung Hang Suh, Soo Jung Suh, City of Davis, Ben J Newitt, The Davis Center LLC, Melvin R Stover, Emily A Stover, Stover Family Trust, Richard Albert Stinchfield, Robert S. Stinchfield Separate Property Revocable Trust, Potter Taylor & Company, Potter Long Adams & Taylor LTD, Potter-Taylor Inc, Potter Taylor & Scurfield Inc and VIC Manufacturing Company
Cross_defendant: Ben J Newitt, The Estate of Phillip Newitt, The Davis Center LLC, Workroom Supply Inc, Safety-Kleen Corporation, City of Davis, Melvin R Stover, Emily A Stover, Stover Family Trust, Richard Albert Stinchfield, Robert S. Stinchfield Separate Property Revocable Trust, The Barbara Ellen Stinchfield Testamentary Trust, Marie Whitcombe, Jung Hang Suh, Soo Jung Suh, Jung K Seo, Charles H Lewis, Jane W Lewis, Potter Taylor & Company, Potter Long Adams & Taylor LTD, Davis Center, Potter-Taylor Inc, Potter Taylor & Scurfield Inc, Irene Russell, Jensen Corporation, Martinizing Frnachieses Inc., aka/dba Martinizing Dry Cleaning, Martin Franchising, Inc. and VIC Manufacturing Company
Thirdparty_plaintiff: The Davis Center LLC, Melvin R Stover, Emily A Stover, Stover Family Trust, Richard Albert Stinchfield, Robert S. Stinchfield Separate Property Revocable Trust and The Barbara Ellen Stinchfield Testamentary Trust
Thirdparty_defendant: Potter Taylor & Company, Potter Long Adams & Taylor LTD, Davis Center, Potter-Taylor Inc, Potter Taylor & Scurfield Inc and Martin Franchises, Inc.
Intervenor: Alex Antipa and Grace Cheng
Case Number: 2:2003cv02646
Filed: December 9, 2003
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Yolo
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Unassigned - CIV
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9607
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 556 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/4/19 ORDERING that this Action be dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. CASE CLOSED. (Kaminski, H)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 554 MEMORANDUM, OPINION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/16/19 GRANTING 551 Joint Motion for Good Faith Settlement; ORDERING that the settlement agreement reached by the settling parties is in good faith and is a fair, adequ ate, and reasonable settlement; DISMISSING all pending claims and cross-claims against the settling parties with prejudice; ORDERING that the Covenant constitutes an administrative settlement with the State for purposes of CERCLA §9613(f)(2); and BARRING any and all claims or future claims for contribution or indemnity, arising out of the facts alleged in the Second Amended Complaint, and as further identified and provided for in the settlement regardless of when such claims were asserted or by whom. (Coll, A)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 550 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/6/2019 CONTINUING Final Pretrial Conference to 12/9/2019 at 01:30 PM and Jury Trial to 2/25/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Zignago, K.)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 548 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/1/2019 ORDERING that the Final Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED to 8/19/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; and the Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 10/29/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Washington, S)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 545 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/7/2019 ORDERING the Final Pretrial Conference RESET to 4/1/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, and the Jury Trial RESET to 6/25/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Huang, H)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 543 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/21/2018 CONTINUING Final Pretrial Conference to 1/28/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; Jury Trial to 4/23/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Zignago, K.)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 541 STIPULATION and ORDER for continuance 540 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/14/2018: The Pretrial Conference is reset for 10/22/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Jury Trial is reset for 1/23/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 539 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/6/2018 GRANTING 533 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Washington, S) Modified on 2/6/2018 (Washington, S).
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 537 STIPULATION and ORDER for continuance 536 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/26/2018 resetting the Final Pretrial Conference for 6/18/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Jury Trial is reset for 8/7/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 532 STIPULATION and ORDER 531 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/22/2017 continuing the Dispositive Motions deadline to 12/15/2017. The Final Pretrial Conference is reset for 2/26/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Jury Trial is reset for 5/1/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 529 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/23/17, ORDERING that the Dispositive motion filing deadline is RESET to 9/25/2017. The Final Pretrial Conference is RESET to 11/20/2017 at 01:30 PM, and the Jury Trial is RESET to 1/30/2018 at 09:00 AM, in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kastilahn, A)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 525 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/16/2017 ORDERING that the hearing on the City's 498 Motion to Compel and for Sanctions is CONTINUED to 8/23/2017 at 10:00 AM. (Zignago, K.)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 522 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/4/2017 ORDERING the deadline for Plaintiffs to file a motion to substitute party for Charles H. Lewis (deceased) and Jane W. Lewis (deceased) is EXTENDED to 6/23/2017. (Washington, S)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 521 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/4/2017 ORDERING that the hearing on 498 Motion to Compel and for Sanctions is CONTINUED to 6/21/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Zignago, K.)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/23/2017 ORDERING The Davis Center, LLC's, Motion Hearing 498 is CONTINUED to 5/10/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Reader, L)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 514 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/17/17 ORDERING that the hearing re 498 is CONTINUED to 3/1/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 512 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/21/16 ORDERING that the following scheduling dates are RESET: Dispositive Motions filed by 6/23/2017; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb and Jury Trial set for 10/31/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Benson, A)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/7/2016 ORDERING 498 the Motion to Compel Hearing is Reset to 1/25/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Reader, L)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 508 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/26/2016 ORDERING that the hearing re 498 Motion to Compel and for Sanctions is CONTINUED to 12/14/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Zignago, K.)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 505 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/20/2016 ORDERING that the hearing re 498 Motion to Compel and for Sanctions is CONTINUED to 11/2/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Zignago, K.)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 504 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/14/2016 ORDERING the Hearing on 498 MOTION to COMPEL and for Sanctions as to Defendant The Davis Center, LLC, et al., is CONTINUED to 10/26/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Jackson, T)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 497 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/11/16 ORDERING the Cross-Claims filed by Third-Party (Cross) Plaintiffs Jung Hang Suh and Soo Jung Suh in the above-entitled action on 5/16/2004 be, and hereby are, DISMISSED in their entirety, WITH PREJUDICE, as to Third-Party (Cross) Defendant Marie L. Whitcombe, individually and as Trustee of the Marie L. Whitcombe Trust, only. (Jackson, T)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 481 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/15/2015 ORDERING 480 Disclosure of Expert Witnesses due by 3/14/2016; Rebuttal experts and production of rebuttal expert reports 5/10/2016; Discovery due by 9/21/2016; Dispositive M otions filed by 12/23/2016; Final Pretrial Conference Reset for 2/27/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; and Jury Trial Reset for 4/25/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Reader, L)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 479 STIPULATION and ORDER 478 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/12/2014: For good cause and pursuant to the above stipulation of the Participating Parties, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Disclosure of experts and production of reports must occur no later than 9/14/2015; 2. Rebuttal experts and production of rebuttal expert reports must occur no later than 11/10/2015; 3. All discovery must be completed no later than 3/21/2016; 4. All motions to be filed no later than 5/23/2016; 5. Final Pretrial Conference is reset for 7/18/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; 6. Jury Trial is reset for 9/20/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 477 STIPULATION and ORDER 475 for extension of 457 Scheduling Order deadlines signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/18/2014. Disclosure of Expert Witnesses shall occur no later than 1/12/2015. Rebuttal Experts and Production of Rebuttal Expert Reports must occur by 3/10/2015. All Discovery must now be completed by 7/20/2015. All Motions to be filed by 9/21/2015. Final Pretrial Conference is RE-SET for 11/23/2015 at 2:00 PM and Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 1/20/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS). All other dates set forth in 457 Motion to Amend Status Order shall remain the same. (Marciel, M)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER granting 461 Motion to Dismiss signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/18/13. (Kaminski, H)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 460 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/18/13 ORDERING that the parties must disclose experts and produce reports in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) by no later than 3/12/14. Experts whose testimony is intended solely for rebuttal must be disclosed and reports produced in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) on or before 5/10/14. (Meuleman, A) Modified on 9/19/2013 (Meuleman, A).
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/29/13: 447 Motion is GRANTED. Discovery due by 9/19/2014. Dispositive Motions filed by 11/21/2014. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 1/20/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Jury Trial set for 3/17/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kaminski, H)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/9/2013 GRANTING 441 Notice of Settlement; CONFIRMING, APPROVING and DETERMINING that said settlement was made in good faith; DISMISSING, with prejudice, all claims asserted in this action against D efendant Safety-Kleen; FOREVER BARRING all claims relating to the facts of this action, including, but not limited to, claims for contribution and indemnity that have been or that could have been asserted against Safety-Kleen; ORDERING that the Uniform Comparative Fault Act (UCFA) be applied to the Lewis / Safety-Kleen Settlement. (Michel, G)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 439 STIPULATION and ORDER 438 for Dismissal signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/11/2013. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that each of remaining cross-claims asserted by City of Davis ("City") in First Amended Crossclaims in Lewis et al. v. Russ ell et al. (2:03-CV-02646 WBS AC) is DISMISSED with prejudice asagainst Martin Franchises, Inc. ("Martin") ONLY (and not against any other party, person or entity in the action) pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. According to t erms and conditions in Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release of Claims between the City and Martin, having an effective date of 11/19/2012 (Settlement Agreement): (1) cost recovery under Comprehensive Environmental Response, Compensation, and Liabi lity Act of 1980 (CERCLA) section 107(a); (2) contribution under CERCLA section 113(f); (3) public nuisance under California Code of Civil Procedure (CCP) section 731; (4) public nuisance under Davis Municipal Code section 23.0.0 et seq.; (5) declara tory relief under CERCLA section 113(g); (6) contribution andequitable indemnity; and (7) declaratory relief under 28 U.S.C. section 2201. IT IS FURTHER HEREBY ORDERED that Court maintains jurisdiction to enforce terms of Settlement Agreement. IT IS FURTHER HEREBY ORDERED that City and Martin shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees with respect to dismissed cross-claims, as provided in Settlement Agreement. (Marciel, M)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 434 MEMORANDUM and ORDER RE: MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND BARRING CONTRIBUTION CLAIMS signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 11/08/12 ORDERING that the settlement between Workroom and Lewis is APPROVED; all claims asserted by Lewis against Wor kroom in the SAC be, and hereby are, DISMISSED with prejudice; all claims for contribution or indemnity against Workroom arising out of the clean-up of the Property are BARRED; and Section 6 of the UCFA is ADOPTED as the law in this case for the purpose of determining the legal effect of the settlement agreement on the liability of the non-settling defendants. (Benson, A.)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 433 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 10/16/12 ORDERING that this case is STAYED between City of Davis and Martin Franchises, Inc.; if the settlement cannot be finalized by 11/23/12, the stay of the current proceedings between the City and Martin shall terminate and the proceedings, including the City's Rule 56(d) submission, Martin's opposition thereto, and any rulings by the Court on the Rule 56(d) submission and Martin's summary judgment motion as to the Cit y's CERCLA and nuisance claims, shall recommence and proceed in due course. Should the stay of the current proceedings between them terminate, the City shall have 10 days from such termination to file its Rule 56(d) submission and Martin shall have 10 days from the City's submission to file its opposition thereto. (Benson, A.)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 10/2/12. The Court will give the City ten days from the date of this Order to file a request pursuant to Rule 56(d). Any request shall be supported by an affidavit showing why the City needs additional time to gather facts essential to oppose Martin's MOTION for Summary Judgment, how much additional time it needs, and what discovery it plans to do in that time.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 403 STIPULATION and ORDER for Dismissal with prejudice of Defendant/Third Party Defendant Martin Franchises, Inc. 402 signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 7/10/2012. (Kirksey Smith, K)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 3/13/2012 ORDERING that as a result of this Court's 2/29/2012 Order approving the settlement agreement between Plaintiff Charles H. Lewis and Ben J. Newitt, Mr. Newitt is DISMISSED with prejudice from all claims in this action.(Waggoner, D)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 375 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 2/28/12 ORDERING that the Settlement between Newitt and Lewis is APPROVED. All claims for contribution or indemnity against Newitt arising out of the clean-up of the propterty are barred. All c laims for contribution or indemnity against Lewis arising out of the conterclaim asserted against him by Newitt are barred. All Claims asserted by Lewis against Newitt in the Sac be are DISMISSED with prejudice. All Counter-claims asserted by Newitt against Lewis are DISMISSED with prejudice. All Crossclaims asserted by Newitt are DISMISSED with prejudice. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 370 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 1/20/12, ORDERING that Vic's 351 , 352 motions for judgment on the pleadings are GRANTED. (Kastilahn, A)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 359 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 12/19/2011 DISMISSING Newitt's Claims with prejudice as to Defendant Vic Manufacturing Company. The dismissal is expressly conditioned upon the terms and conditions of that certain Mutual Release of Claims entered into by and between Newitt and Vic having an Effective Date of 11/30/2011. The Court retains jurisdiction of this matter for the sole purpose of taking any action needed to enforce the terms of the Release. Each of the parties hereto shall bear its own costs, including attorneys fees, as provided in the Release. (Michel, G)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 357 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 12/15/11: Newitt's Claims in this action be, and hereby are, dismissed, as against defendant Martin Franchises, Inc. only, with prejudice. Each of the parties hereto shall bear his/its own costs, including attorney's fees, as provided in the Release. (Kaminski, H)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 12/9/2011 ORDERING that Brady & Vinding WITHDRAWS as co-counsel for Potter-Taylor & Co., Potter Long Adams & Taylor Ltd., Potter-Taylor Inc., and Potter-Taylor & Scurfield, Inc., cross-claimants, counter-clai mants, third party defendants, cross-defendants and counter-defendants in the above-entitled matter. Jeffory J. Scharff will continue representation of Potter-Taylor & Co., Potter Long Adams & Taylor Ltd., Potter-Taylor Inc., and Potter-Taylor & Scurfield, Inc. in this matter. Attorney Michael Erik Vinding terminated. (Zignago, K.)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 350 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 11/7/2011 ORDERING 349 that the action be, and hereby is, DISMISSED as against defendant Vic Manufacturing Company only, with prejudice; that the dismissal is expressly conditioned upon the terms and conditions of that certain Mutual Release of Claims entered into by and between Lewis and Vic having an Effective Date of 11/1/2011 (the "Release"); that the Court retains jurisdiction of this matter for the sole purpose of taking any action needed to enforce the terms of the Release; and that each of the parties hereto shall bear its own costs, including attorney's fees, as provided in the Release. VIC Manufacturing Company. (Reader, L)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 348 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/19/11 ORDERING defendant Martin Franchises Inc., aka/dba Martinizing Dry Cleaning, Only Dismissed, with prejudice; the dismissal is expressly conditioned upon the terms and conditions of tha t certain Mutual Release of Claims entered into by and between Lewis and Martin having an Effective Date of 9/13/11 (the "Release"); the Court retains jurisdiction of this matter for the sole purpose of taking any action needed to enforce the terms of the Release; each of the parties hereto shall bear its own costs, including attorney's fees, as provided in the Release. (Becknal, R)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 344 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 4/14/11: Discovery due by 4/29/2011. Dispositive Motions filed by 5/23/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/21/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. Jury Trial set for 9/16/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Kaminski, H)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER RE: Resetting Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 3/17/11: Initial Scheduling Conference is reset for 4/18/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Matson, R)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 333 MEMORADUM AND ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 1/18/11, ORDERING that dft Vic Manufacturing Company's 317 motion to lift the automatic bankruptcy stay is GRANTED. Pltfs Charles H. Lewis and Jane W. Lewis (Deceased) and certain dfts' 319 motion to maintain the litigation stay is DENIED. A Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference shall be held on March 21, 2011, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom No. 5; and the clerk's office shall issue such order accordingly. (Kastilahn, A)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 4/14/2009 ORDERING all parties that have not yet responded to the courts request for briefing shall file a brief discussing the scope and effect of the automatic bankruptcy stay on future proceedings in this case no later than 5:00 p.m. on 4/22/2009; Counsel for all parties shall appear at a hearing on the issue of the automatic bankruptcy stay at 2:00 p.m. on 5/4/2009; and all other proceedings and discovery in this action are stayed pending the court's determination of the effect of the automatic bankruptcy stay.(Matson, R)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 4/13/09 ORDERING that Defendant SAFETY-KLEEN SYSTEMS, INC. shall appear telephonically at the hearing on Defendant And Third Party Claimant The Davis Center, LLC's Motion For Order Granting Leave To Amend Complaint, Cross-Complaints To Name Additional Defendants And Assert Claims on April 13, 2009, at 2:00 p.m. The clerk of the court will initiate the call to attorney Bethany A. Stahley at (415) 875-3254. (Becknal, R)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER REQUESTING BRIEFING signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 4/1/2009: In light of the 9/12/2008 Order dissolving the stay of litigation, the court requests briefing from the non-bankrupt parties addressing the effect § 362 has on the future proceedings in this action. The non-bankrupt parties are to state their positions and supporting authority in briefs filed with the court by 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, 4/7/2009. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis, et al v. Russell, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles H Lewis
Represented By: Stephen Craig Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane W Lewis
Represented By: Stephen Craig Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben J Newitt
Represented By: Derek Paul Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Phillip Newitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jung Hang Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soo Jung Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jung K Seo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Davis Center LLC
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Workroom Supply Inc
Represented By: Matthew Robert Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety-Kleen Corporation
Represented By: Linda Moin Moroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Davis
Represented By: John R. Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin R Stover
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily A Stover
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stover Family Trust
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Albert Stinchfield
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Stinchfield Separate Property Revocable Trust
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Barbara Ellen Stinchfield Testamentary Trust
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene Russell
Represented By: Daniel William Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinizing Frnachieses Inc., aka/dba Martinizing Dry Cleaning
Represented By: P Gerhardt Zacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Franchising, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin N. Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIC Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Paul P. DeAngelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Jung Hang Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Soo Jung Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: City of Davis
Represented By: Catherine Ware Kilduff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: The Davis Center LLC
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Melvin R Stover
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Emily A Stover
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Stover Family Trust
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Richard Albert Stinchfield
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Robert S. Stinchfield Separate Property Revocable Trust
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: The Barbara Ellen Stinchfield Testamentary Trust
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Ben J Newitt
Represented By: Derek Paul Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Marie Whitcombe
Represented By: Steven H. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Potter Taylor & Company
Represented By: Jeffory J. Scharff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Potter Long Adams & Taylor LTD
Represented By: Jeffory J. Scharff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Davis Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Potter-Taylor Inc
Represented By: Jeffory J. Scharff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Potter Taylor & Scurfield Inc
Represented By: Jeffory J. Scharff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Charles H Lewis
Represented By: Stephen Craig Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Jane W Lewis
Represented By: Stephen Craig Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Jung Hang Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Soo Jung Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Potter Taylor & Company
Represented By: Jeffory J. Scharff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Potter Long Adams & Taylor LTD
Represented By: Jeffory J. Scharff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Davis Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Potter-Taylor Inc
Represented By: Jeffory J. Scharff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Potter Taylor & Scurfield Inc
Represented By: Jeffory J. Scharff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: The Davis Center LLC
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Jung Hang Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Soo Jung Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: City of Davis
Represented By: Jennifer Hartman King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Ben J Newitt
Represented By: Derek Paul Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: The Davis Center LLC
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Melvin R Stover
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Emily A Stover
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Stover Family Trust
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Richard Albert Stinchfield
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Robert S. Stinchfield Separate Property Revocable Trust
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Potter Taylor & Company
Represented By: Jeffory J. Scharff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Potter Long Adams & Taylor LTD
Represented By: Jeffory J. Scharff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Potter-Taylor Inc
Represented By: Jeffory J. Scharff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Potter Taylor & Scurfield Inc
Represented By: Jeffory J. Scharff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: VIC Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Alexander M. Weyand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Ben J Newitt
Represented By: Derek Paul Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: The Estate of Phillip Newitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: The Davis Center LLC
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Workroom Supply Inc
Represented By: Matthew Robert Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Safety-Kleen Corporation
Represented By: Bethany A. Stahley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: City of Davis
Represented By: Jennifer Hartman King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Melvin R Stover
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Emily A Stover
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Stover Family Trust
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Richard Albert Stinchfield
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Robert S. Stinchfield Separate Property Revocable Trust
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: The Barbara Ellen Stinchfield Testamentary Trust
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Marie Whitcombe
Represented By: Michael John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Jung Hang Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Soo Jung Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Jung K Seo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Charles H Lewis
Represented By: Stephen Craig Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Jane W Lewis
Represented By: Stephen Craig Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Potter Taylor & Company
Represented By: Jeffory J. Scharff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Potter Long Adams & Taylor LTD
Represented By: Jeffory J. Scharff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Davis Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Potter-Taylor Inc
Represented By: Jeffory J. Scharff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Potter Taylor & Scurfield Inc
Represented By: Jeffory J. Scharff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Irene Russell
Represented By: Daniel William Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Jensen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Martinizing Frnachieses Inc., aka/dba Martinizing Dry Cleaning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Martin Franchising, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: VIC Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: The Davis Center LLC
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Melvin R Stover
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Emily A Stover
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Stover Family Trust
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Richard Albert Stinchfield
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Robert S. Stinchfield Separate Property Revocable Trust
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: The Barbara Ellen Stinchfield Testamentary Trust
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Potter Taylor & Company
Represented By: Jeffory J. Scharff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Potter Long Adams & Taylor LTD
Represented By: Jeffory J. Scharff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Davis Center
Represented By: Chad Nathan Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Potter-Taylor Inc
Represented By: Jeffory J. Scharff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Potter Taylor & Scurfield Inc
Represented By: Jeffory J. Scharff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Martin Franchises, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew P. Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Alex Antipa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Grace Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?